This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:01:03 (UTC).

Larson v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2015 Larson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bennett Larson

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Javier Espinoza

Attorney at ESPINOZA LAW FIRM, PLLC

2211 Danbury St.

San Antonio, TX 78217

Defendant Attorneys

Trek C. Doyle

Attorney at Doyle & Seelbach PLLC

7500 Rialto Blvd.,, Building 1, Suite 250

Austin, TX 78735

Scott F. Courtney, Jr.

Attorney at Winstead PC

401 Congress Ave., Ste 2100

Austin, TX 78701

James G. Ruiz

Attorney at Winstead PC

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 2100

Austin, TX 78701

Karl W. Seelbach

Attorney at Doyle & Seelbach PLLC

7500 Rialto Blvd., Bldg. 1, Suite 250

Austin, TX 78735

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER (Setting Pretrial Conference for 6/1/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

#8

(#8) ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL INCORRECT CASE NUMBER LISTED IN HEADING OF DOCUMENT, PLEASE RE-FILE*** RE: 7 Notice of Appearance. (sf) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#2

(#2) Letter/Correspondence to attorney Lara Brock regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (rg) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

#11

(#11) ADR Report Filed - by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.(Courtney, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 4/1/2015, Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 9:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/1/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2015, Discovery due by 2/1/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

#7

(#7) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT- INCORRECT CASE NUMBER LISTED IN HEADING OF CASE*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James G. Ruiz on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. Attorney James G. Ruiz added to party Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft) (Ruiz, James) Modified on 5/8/2015 advise of deficiency (sf). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#6

(#6) CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: ORDER GRANTING re 5 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order) filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (wg) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-7194222), filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James G. Ruiz on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Ruiz, James) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Trek C. Doyle and Karl Seelbach) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#3

(#3) Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER (Setting Pretrial Conference for 6/1/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ADR Report Filed - by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.(Courtney, Scott) (Entered: 09/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Trek C. Doyle and Karl Seelbach) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James G. Ruiz on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Ruiz, James) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL INCORRECT CASE NUMBER LISTED IN HEADING OF DOCUMENT, PLEASE RE-FILE*** RE: 7 Notice of Appearance. (sf) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT- INCORRECT CASE NUMBER LISTED IN HEADING OF CASE*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James G. Ruiz on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. Attorney James G. Ruiz added to party Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft) (Ruiz, James) Modified on 5/8/2015 advise of deficiency (sf). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: ORDER GRANTING re 5 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order) filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (wg) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (for Entry of Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 4/1/2015, Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 9:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/1/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2015, Discovery due by 2/1/2016, Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter/Correspondence to attorney Lara Brock regarding Admission to Practice in the Western District of Texas. (rg) (Entered: 02/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-7194222), filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Doyle, Trek) (Entered: 02/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.