This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 08:53:04 (UTC).

Landmark Technology LLC v. Abercrombie & Fitch Company

Case Summary

On 04/04/2014 Landmark Technology LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Abercrombie Fitch Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Michael H. Schneider. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-00243

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Michael H. Schneider

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Landmark Technology LLC

Counter Claimants

Hitachi America, Ltd

Boyd Gaming Corp.

Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.

Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc.

Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.

Abercrombie & Fitch Company

Consolidated Defendants

Harley-Davidson, Inc.

Caesars Entertainment Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Charles Ainsworth

Stanley M Gibson

Robert Christopher Bunt

Reza Mirzaie

Craig D Leavell

Adam Michael Kaufmann

William E Devitt

William West Allen

Colby Brian Springer

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

P Weston Musselman, Jr

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Eugene Andrew Feher

James C Hall

Paul J Cronin

Paul Brown Kerlin

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

P Weston Musselman, Jr

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

David M Stein

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street, 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Iftikhar Ahmed

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld - Houston

1111 Louisiana, 44Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld - Dallas

911 West Loop 281, Suite 412

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#68

#69

#70

#71

#72

#73

#74

#75

#76

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) FINAL JUDGMENT that Plaintiffs' claims be dismissed with prejudice, and final judgment be entered in this case. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Abercrombie & Fitch Company, Landmark Technology LLC. All claims against Abercrombie & Fitch Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/17/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) STIPULATION of Dismissal between Landmark Technology and Abercrombie & Fitch by Abercrombie & Fitch Company, Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER granting 72 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc., Landmark Technology LLC. All claims against Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. and Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) STIPULATION of Dismissal between Landmark Technology and Harley-Davidson by Harley-Davidson Financial Services, Inc., Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE by Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. of Request to Terminate Electronic Notices (Feher, Eugene) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE by Hitachi America, Ltd to terminate electronic notification of filings for Adam Kaufmann (Kaufmann, Adam) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE by Hitachi America, Ltd to terminate electronic notification of filings for Craig Leavell (Leavell, Craig) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER granting 66 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc., Landmark Technology LLC. All claims against Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/14. (mll, ) Modified on 12/5/2014 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Landmark Technology LLC re 9 Order,,,, Regarding Additional Related Cases in the District (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:14cv243, for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. All future filings should be made in Lead Case 6:14cv243. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within 5 days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. Within 5 days of this order, the Plaintiff also must file a notice indicating whether Plaintiff anticipates filing any additional related cases in this district. If the cases are not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Abercrombie & Fitch Company and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley M Gibson on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Gibson, Stanley) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abercrombie & Fitch Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4598219.), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '319 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '319 C1, # 4 Exhibit C - '319 C2)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boyd Gaming Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Harley-Davidson Financial Services Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HITACHI AMERICA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT CORP. is a litigant