This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:02:36 (UTC).

Kutnyak v. Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2014 Kutnyak filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Senior Judge David C Bury. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-01973

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Senior Judge David C Bury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Kutnyak

Defendants

Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated

One World Technologies Incorporated

Unknown Parties

Ryobi Technologies Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John K Chapman

Attorney at Heygood Orr & Pearson

2331 W Northwest Hwy., 2Nd Fl.

Dallas, TX 75220

Charles Wade Miller

Attorney at Heygood Orr & Pearson

2331 W Northwest Hwy, 2Nd Fl.

Dallas, TX 75220

Eric D Pearson

Attorney at Heygood Orr & Pearson

2331 W Northwest Hwy., 2Nd Fl.

Dallas, TX 75220

Defendant Attorneys

Donald Bernard Petrie

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Cober C Plucker

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Rosario M Vignali

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker - White Plains, NY

1133 Westchester Ave.

White Plains, NY 10604

Douglas M Rowan

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Las Vegas, NV

300 S 4Th St., 11Th Fl.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

James Thomas Tucker

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Las Vegas, NV

300 S 4Th St., 11Th Fl.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20136772. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10252151 filed by Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit)(DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by One World Technologies Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryobi Technologies Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#5

(#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10252151. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C. Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-CV-01973-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.. (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#6

(#6) * ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 3/21/2014 (MFR). (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated. Other: Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual II(B), the automated Civil Cover Sheet should be submitted. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

#8

(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Notice of Removal, 7 Notice of Deficiency by Defendants One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Tucker, James) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: It is Ordered setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/29/2014 at 09:30 AM before Senior Judge David C Bury's law clerk, Cynthia Lorge (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/24/2014. (MFR) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

#40

(#40) ORDER denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice. On July 29, 2015, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. 38.) This dispositive motion may be reinstituted should this action not settle. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury.(DCB, cl)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#39

(#39) IT IS ORDERED the motion hearing for 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated presently set for 10/13/2015 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Bury is VACATED. It will be reset in the future, should the need arise. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury. (DCB)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Settlement by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#37

(#37) Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument for re: 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Senior Judge David C Bury. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury. (DCB, cl)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#36

(#36) STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#35

(#35) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER denying 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice. On July 29, 2015, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. 38.) This dispositive motion may be reinstituted should this action not settle. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury.(DCB, cl)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) IT IS ORDERED the motion hearing for 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated presently set for 10/13/2015 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Bury is VACATED. It will be reset in the future, should the need arise. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury. (DCB)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE of Settlement by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument for re: 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Senior Judge David C Bury. Ordered by Senior Judge David C Bury. (DCB, cl)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Petrie, Donald) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eric D. Pearson by Randy Kutnyak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pearson, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: It is Ordered setting a Scheduling Conference for 5/29/2014 at 09:30 AM before Senior Judge David C Bury's law clerk, Cynthia Lorge (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/24/2014. (MFR) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Notice of Removal, 7 Notice of Deficiency by Defendants One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated. (Tucker, James) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated. Other: Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual II(B), the automated Civil Cover Sheet should be submitted. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) * ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by One World Technologies Incorporated, Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 3/21/2014 (MFR). (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10252151. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C. Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-CV-01973-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.. (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryobi Technologies Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by One World Technologies Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20136772. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10252151 filed by Ryobi Technologies Incorporated, One World Technologies Incorporated, Techtronic Industries North America Incorporated.(Tucker, James) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit)(DLC) (Entered: 03/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.