This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 05:36:47 (UTC).

KLAYMAN et al v. OBAMA et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2014 KLAYMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against OBAMA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES STRANGE

MATT GARRISON

MICHAEL FERRARI

MARY ANN STRANGE

LARRY E. KLAYMAN

Washington, DC 20006

Petitioner

DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON

Miramar Beach, FL 32550

Defendants

JAMES CLAPPER

CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

JOHN BRENNAN

JAMES R. CLAPPER, JR.

JAMES B. COMEY

ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.

JOHN O. BRENNAN

DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY

JAMES COMEY

KEITH B. ALEXANDER

ROGER VINSON

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry E. Klayman

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LARRY KLAYMAN

2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 345

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

James J. Gilligan

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw, Room 5138

Washington, DC 20001

Rodney Patton

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20044

Bryan Scott Dearinger

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20044

Julia A. Berman

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3600001) filed by MARY ANN STRANGE, CHARLES STRANGE, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, MICHAEL FERRARI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Related Case Forms, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/23/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-851 & 13-cv-881. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/24/2014)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (13) Issued as to KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROGER VINSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent Form)(kb) (Entered: 01/24/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Join, MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf, ). (Entered: 03/07/2014)

#5

(#5) Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION to Join MOTION to Intervene Filed by David Andrew Christenson filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Certify Class by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/7/2014. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

#8

(#8) LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, Motion for Emergency Stay This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied". Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (zrdj) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Stay Class Certification Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Government Defendants Rule 12(b) Motion by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Filing by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Filing by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#44

(#44) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, (Amended) filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#43

(#43) RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion to Lift Stay Pending Appeal and Motion for In Camera Interview and Notice of New Case Authority filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

#42

(#42) MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (29 in 1:14-cv-00092-RJL, 124 in 1:13-cv-00851-RJL, 85 in 1:13-cv-00881-RJL) Notice of Appeal, filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. ORDERED that the motions be denied and, on the court's own motion, the appeal be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). USCA Case Numbers 14-5207, 14-5208 and 14-5209. (rd) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#41

(#41) REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

#40

(#40) REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for In Chambers and Ex Parte Interview of Witness Dennis Montgomery filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#39

(#39) Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#38

(#38) RESPONSE re 35 MOTION for In Chambers and Ex Parte Interview of Witness Dennis Montgomery (The Government Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For In Chambers And Ex Parte Interview Of Witness Dennis Montgomery) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE of Filing by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of Filing by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, (Amended) filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion to Lift Stay Pending Appeal and Motion for In Camera Interview and Notice of New Case Authority filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (29 in 1:14-cv-00092-RJL, 124 in 1:13-cv-00851-RJL, 85 in 1:13-cv-00881-RJL) Notice of Appeal, filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. ORDERED that the motions be denied and, on the court's own motion, the appeal be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). USCA Case Numbers 14-5207, 14-5208 and 14-5209. (rd) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for In Chambers and Ex Parte Interview of Witness Dennis Montgomery filed by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION to Lift Stay re Order Staying Case, filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) RESPONSE re 35 MOTION for In Chambers and Ex Parte Interview of Witness Dennis Montgomery (The Government Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For In Chambers And Ex Parte Interview Of Witness Dennis Montgomery) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 MOTION for In Chambers and Ex Parte Interview of Witness Dennis Montgomery by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION To Remove Stay On Preliminary Injunction Order Of December 16, 2013 by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Stay Class Certification Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Government Defendants Rule 12(b) Motion by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 04/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, Motion for Emergency Stay This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied". Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (zrdj) (Entered: 04/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/7/2014. (lcrjl1, ) (Entered: 04/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Certify Class by MICHAEL FERRARI, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION to Join MOTION to Intervene Filed by David Andrew Christenson filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan) (Entered: 03/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Join, MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf, ). (Entered: 03/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (13) Issued as to KEITH B. ALEXANDER, JOHN O. BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES CLAPPER, JAMES COMEY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROGER VINSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent Form)(kb) (Entered: 01/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-851 & 13-cv-881. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3600001) filed by MARY ANN STRANGE, CHARLES STRANGE, MATT GARRISON, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, MICHAEL FERRARI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Related Case Forms, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.