This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 18:32:44 (UTC).

Kim Shelby v. Tufamerica Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 Kim Shelby filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tufamerica Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott and Judge Margaret M. Morrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05073

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott

Judge

Judge Margaret M. Morrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Shelby

Defendant

Does

3Rd Party Plaintiff

Tufamerica Inc

3Rd Party Defendants

On-Demand Publishing LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Gregory Casella

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly D Talcott

Elaine W Yu

Melvin N A Avanzado

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Gregory L Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16028357 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Kim Shelby(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Tufamerica Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

#9

(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. ALL EXHIBITS/DECLARATIONS TO THE MAIN DOCUMENT MUST BE COMBINED INTO ONE PDF if applicable. Do not submit separately unless the document has a title page pursuant to Local Rules 11-3.8. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/07/2015)

#31

(#31) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Striking Proofs of Service by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), 28 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), 29 . Title page is missing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#30

(#30) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2015; On-Demand Publishing LLC answer now due 1/8/2015, re Third Party Complaint 22 filed by Third Party Defendants Amazon.com, Inc.; On-Demand Publishing LLC.(Attorney Gregory L Doll added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Gregory L Doll added to party On-Demand Publishing LLC(pty:3pd))(Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

#29

(#29) [STRICKEN] PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Tufamerica Inc, upon Third Party Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Yu, Elaine) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ah). (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#28

(#28) [STRICKEN] PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Tufamerica Inc, upon Third Party Defendant On-Demand Publishing LLC served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Yu, Elaine) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ah). (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#27

(#27) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint 22 as to Third Party Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., On-Demand Publishing LLC. (bm) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#26

(#26) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Yu, Elaine) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 23 , Summons Request 24 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The space below the caption entitled "To:Defendant(s):"must contain the names of all defendants or be left blank. The court does not issue single summonses to individual defendants. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

#24

(#24) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#23

(#23) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) Striking Proofs of Service by Judge Margaret M. Morrow re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), 28 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), 29 . Title page is missing. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2015; On-Demand Publishing LLC answer now due 1/8/2015, re Third Party Complaint 22 filed by Third Party Defendants Amazon.com, Inc.; On-Demand Publishing LLC.(Attorney Gregory L Doll added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Gregory L Doll added to party On-Demand Publishing LLC(pty:3pd))(Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) [STRICKEN] PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Tufamerica Inc, upon Third Party Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Yu, Elaine) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ah). (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) [STRICKEN] PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Tufamerica Inc, upon Third Party Defendant On-Demand Publishing LLC served on 11/13/2015, answer due 12/4/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Yu, Elaine) Modified on 12/9/2015 (ah). (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint 22 as to Third Party Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., On-Demand Publishing LLC. (bm) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Yu, Elaine) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 23 , Summons Request 24 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The space below the caption entitled "To:Defendant(s):"must contain the names of all defendants or be left blank. The court does not issue single summonses to individual defendants. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint 22 filed by THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS Amazon.com, Inc., On-Demand Publishing LLC, filed by DEFENDANT AND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Tufamerica Inc.(Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby, upon Defendant Tufamerica Inc served on 8/12/2015, answer due 9/2/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aaron Fuch- Authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Margaret M. Morrow is participating in a pilot project regarding the submission of SEALED DOCUMENTS. All proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judge's Chambers email at MMM_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. ALL EXHIBITS/DECLARATIONS TO THE MAIN DOCUMENT MUST BE COMBINED INTO ONE PDF if applicable. Do not submit separately unless the document has a title page pursuant to Local Rules 11-3.8. Please refer to the judge's procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Tufamerica Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby, (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16028357 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kim Shelby. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Kim Shelby(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less