This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:53:35 (UTC).

Kelly v. Shearin et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2014 Kelly filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Shearin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard D Bennett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00717

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard D Bennett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anthony Quintin Kelly

Cumberland, MD 21502

Respondents

John McCarthy

Bobby F. Shearin

Attorney General of Maryland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Edward John Kelley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Maryland

200 Saint Paul Pl 17Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Quintin Kelly (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#3

(#3) Request Emergency Transfer to a Federal or State Halfway House Pending Review of a Decision in Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Proceeding Under Federal Rule 23(c),(b)(2)(3),(c)) by Anthony Quintin Kelly (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying 3 Petitioner's Request for Emergency Transfer to a Federal or State Halfway House ; granting 2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting Petitioner an additional 28 days to file a Supplemental Petition. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/13/14.(c/m af 3/13/14) (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

#5

(#5) Emergency Federal Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 (Supplement) by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

#6

(#6) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

#7

(#7) Emergency Federal Habeas Corpus Supplement Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

#8

(#8) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2014)

#9

(#9) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2014)

#33

(#33) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Emergency Motion to release petitioner's on personal recognizance, with conditions, pending final resolution of this habeas corpus proceeding. (jb3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#34

(#34) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Emergency Motion to transfer petitioner's to the lawrence court-halfway house, pending final resolution of this appeal. (jb3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#35

(#35) Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Request for an updated status report for the case. (kr, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#36

(#36) JUDGMENT of USCA dismissing the appeal and denying a certificate of appealability as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#37

(#37) STAY OF MANDATE of USCA as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#38

(#38) ORDER of USCA "DENYING" petition for rehearing and the motions requesting a video teleconference as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER denying 27 Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay the Judgment Pending Resolution of the Appeal; denying 29 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 32 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Release of Petitioner on Personal Recognizance. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/4/2015. (c/m 3/6/15) (kr, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

#40

(#40) MANDATE of USCA as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#41

(#41) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Request for Copywork and Waiver of Fees. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Request for Copywork and Waiver of Fees. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MANDATE of USCA as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER denying 27 Petitioner's Emergency Motion to Stay the Judgment Pending Resolution of the Appeal; denying 29 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 32 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Release of Petitioner on Personal Recognizance. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/4/2015. (c/m 3/6/15) (kr, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER of USCA "DENYING" petition for rehearing and the motions requesting a video teleconference as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) STAY OF MANDATE of USCA as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (sls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) JUDGMENT of USCA dismissing the appeal and denying a certificate of appealability as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Request for an updated status report for the case. (kr, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Emergency Motion to transfer petitioner's to the lawrence court-halfway house, pending final resolution of this appeal. (jb3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Correspondence from Petitioner re: Emergency Motion to release petitioner's on personal recognizance, with conditions, pending final resolution of this habeas corpus proceeding. (jb3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Emergency MOTION to Release Petitioner on Personal Recognizance, with Conditions, Pending Final Resolution... by Anthony Quintin Kelly (Rec'd 9/12/2014) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting Respondents an additional 45 days to file a limited show cause response and directing Kelly to file a reply, if any, 28 days after service of Respondents' limited answer. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 5/15/14. (c/m af 5/16/14)(amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Emergency Federal Habeas Corpus Supplement Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correspondence from Petitioner. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Emergency Federal Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 (Supplement) by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying 3 Petitioner's Request for Emergency Transfer to a Federal or State Halfway House ; granting 2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting Petitioner an additional 28 days to file a Supplemental Petition. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/13/14.(c/m af 3/13/14) (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request Emergency Transfer to a Federal or State Halfway House Pending Review of a Decision in Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Proceeding Under Federal Rule 23(c),(b)(2)(3),(c)) by Anthony Quintin Kelly (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Emergency MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Quintin Kelly (amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Quintin Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(amf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less