This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 01:25:09 (UTC).

Keeler et al v. Cristaux Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 Keeler filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cristaux Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-06393

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leo J Keeler

Dorothy A Keeler

Defendant

Cristaux Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elinor Hart Murarova

Steven M. Cowley

Defendant Attorneys

Roger M Masson

David H. Levitt

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler by Elinor L. Hart (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

#4

(#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (cc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler as to Cristaux Inc. on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/9/15 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Tharp's web site, which may be accessed at [www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges] and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/2/15. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cristaux Inc. by David H. Levitt (Levitt, David) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Cristaux Inc.(Levitt, David) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the Defendant's agreed telephonic request, the status hearing is reset for 9/22/15 at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Status Report is due by 9/15/15. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Application to appear pro hac vice 17 is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler by Steven M. Cowley (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: ENTER AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#21

(#21) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 11/12/2015. (Exhibits). Mailed notice.(jj, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. By agreement, all non-retained expert fact discovery shall be completed by 5/13/16. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 1/20/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Murarova, Elinor) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#24

(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii), this case is terminated. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The parties having filed a joint stipulation of dismissal (doc. # 23 ), the status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 1/20/16 is stricken and the referral is hereby terminated. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#26

(#26) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: # 1 Closing Order). (tt, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: # 1 Closing Order). (tt, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The parties having filed a joint stipulation of dismissal (doc. # 23 ), the status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 1/20/16 is stricken and the referral is hereby terminated. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii), this case is terminated. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Murarova, Elinor) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. By agreement, all non-retained expert fact discovery shall be completed by 5/13/16. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 1/20/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 11/12/2015. (Exhibits). Mailed notice.(jj, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: ENTER AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler by Steven M. Cowley (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Application to appear pro hac vice 17 is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11185546. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler (Murarova, Elinor) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Upon the Defendant's agreed telephonic request, the status hearing is reset for 9/22/15 at 9:00 a.m. The Initial Status Report is due by 9/15/15. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/21/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Cristaux Inc.(Levitt, David) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cristaux Inc. by David H. Levitt (Levitt, David) (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/9/15 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Tharp's web site, which may be accessed at [www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges] and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/2/15. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler as to Cristaux Inc. on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (cc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler by Elinor L. Hart (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Dorothy A Keeler, Leo J Keeler; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10892364. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hart, Elinor) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less