This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 08:15:21 (UTC).

KCVN, LLC v. V&S Railway, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2014 KCVN, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against V S Railway, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-02450

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KCVN, LLC

Defendant

V&S Railway, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence W. Treece

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP-Denver

410 17Th Street, Suite 2200

Denver, CO 80202-4432

Mark Todd Barnes

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP-Denver

410 17Th Street, Suite 2200

Denver, CO 80202-4432

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory E. Goldberg

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP-Denver

P.O. Box 8749, 555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80201-8749

Thomas J. Burke, Jr.

Attorney at Burke Law Firm, P.C.

1801 Broadway, #1100

Denver, CO 80202

Sean Michael Hanlon

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP-Denver

P.O. Box 8749, 555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80201-8749

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KCVN, LLC from Crowley District Court, Case Number 14-cv-30012. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-4027448), filed by KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 5-3, # 7 Exhibit 5A, # 8 Exhibit 5A-2, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#3

(#3) Verified COMPLAINT against V&S Railway, LLC, filed by KCVN, LLC.(sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons & Complaint upon Defendant on 08/28/2014, filed by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#6

(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED OR OTHER CASES: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1(a), an attorney who is a member of the U.S. District Court's bar must make an appearance in order to receive notice in any case before the court. The attorney records of the court reflect that the following counsel has not entered an appearance in this case: LAWRENCE W. TREECE. In order to make an appearance in this case and receive any further notice regarding this case, counsel must file an entry of appearance in this case. Absent any Notice of Entry of Appearance filed, no further direct notices to counsel will be sent. Text only entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lawrence W. Treece on behalf of KCVN, LLCAttorney Lawrence W. Treece added to party KCVN, LLC(pty:pla) (Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Todd Barnes on behalf of KCVN, LLCAttorney Mark Todd Barnes added to party KCVN, LLC(pty:pla) (Barnes, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal, Corrections to Certain Erroneous Statements of Fact in Notice of Removal by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#31

(#31) BOND for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction posted by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order. For the reasons stated on the record at the 10/24/2014 Motion Hearing, the Court is treating the Temporary Restraining Order as a Preliminary Injunction. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/31/14. Text Only Entry(cbslc2) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#33

(#33) RECEIPT for Bond for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC re: 30 Order on Motion for Leave, Receipt #65440, amount of $500,000.00. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#34

(#34) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

#35

(#35) ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further order of the court. The parties shall appear for the Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/24/14 at 11:00 AM, at which time they and the court will formulate a schedule for reporting progress with the Surface Transportation Board. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/4/14. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

#36

(#36) MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/24/2014 at 11:00 a.m. is pushed up to 10:30 a.m. Parties participating in the call shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves and call the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry (amont) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#37

(#37) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/24/2014. ORDERED: Parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers at (303) 844-2117 within 72 hours of a ruling from the Surface Transportation Board. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

#38

(#38) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 24, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-87. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Avery Woods Reporting, ) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#39

(#39) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 6, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-76. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Avery Woods Reporting, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 6, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-76. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Avery Woods Reporting, ) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 24, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-87. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Avery Woods Reporting, ) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/24/2014. ORDERED: Parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers at (303) 844-2117 within 72 hours of a ruling from the Surface Transportation Board. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/24/2014 at 11:00 a.m. is pushed up to 10:30 a.m. Parties participating in the call shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves and call the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry (amont) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further order of the court. The parties shall appear for the Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/24/14 at 11:00 AM, at which time they and the court will formulate a schedule for reporting progress with the Surface Transportation Board. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/4/14. Text Only Entry (cbslc2) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) RECEIPT for Bond for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC re: 30 Order on Motion for Leave, Receipt #65440, amount of $500,000.00. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order. For the reasons stated on the record at the 10/24/2014 Motion Hearing, the Court is treating the Temporary Restraining Order as a Preliminary Injunction. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/31/14. Text Only Entry(cbslc2) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) BOND for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction posted by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2014. ORDERED: The Court intends to GRANT MOTION 13 to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order for the reasons stated on the record. Due to the time that has passed since the Temporary Restraining Order has been in place, the Court is treating the Temporary Restraining Order as a Preliminary Injunction, which is to be dissolved. The Court will STAY the effectiveness of the order granting the Motion until October 31, 2014 at 5:00 p.m., to allow the Plaintiff to raise the issue with the Surface Transportation Board. Therefore, a formal Order from the Court granting the Motion will not be entered until October 31, 2014. Plaintiff's MOTION 29 to ReFile Temporary Restraining Order Bond in This Court is GRANTED and the bond may be transferred into the Courts Registry. A Telephonic Status Conference to discuss progress with the Surface Transportation Board is set for November 24, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Parties participating in the conference call, shall first initiate a conference call amongst themselves, and then call the court at (303) 8442117 at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference for 9/12/2014 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall first initiate a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/5/14. (cbssec) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal, Corrections to Certain Erroneous Statements of Fact in Notice of Removal by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Todd Barnes on behalf of KCVN, LLCAttorney Mark Todd Barnes added to party KCVN, LLC(pty:pla) (Barnes, Mark) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lawrence W. Treece on behalf of KCVN, LLCAttorney Lawrence W. Treece added to party KCVN, LLC(pty:pla) (Treece, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED OR OTHER CASES: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1(a), an attorney who is a member of the U.S. District Court's bar must make an appearance in order to receive notice in any case before the court. The attorney records of the court reflect that the following counsel has not entered an appearance in this case: LAWRENCE W. TREECE. In order to make an appearance in this case and receive any further notice regarding this case, counsel must file an entry of appearance in this case. Absent any Notice of Entry of Appearance filed, no further direct notices to counsel will be sent. Text only entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons & Complaint upon Defendant on 08/28/2014, filed by Plaintiff KCVN, LLC (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Verified COMPLAINT against V&S Railway, LLC, filed by KCVN, LLC.(sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KCVN, LLC from Crowley District Court, Case Number 14-cv-30012. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-4027448), filed by KCVN, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 5-3, # 7 Exhibit 5A, # 8 Exhibit 5A-2, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less