This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:59:03 (UTC).

Kater v. Churchill Downs Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/17/2015 Kater filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Churchill Downs Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheryl Kater

Defendant

Churchill Downs Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amir C Missaghi

Attorney at EDELSON PC

350 North Lasalle Street, Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60654

Courtney C Booth

Attorney at EDELSON PC

350 North Lasalle Street, Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60654

Clifford A Cantor

627 208Th Ave Se

Sammamish, WA 98074-7033

Benjamin H. Richman

Attorney at EDELSON PC

350 North Lasalle Street, Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60654

Rafey S Balabanian

Attorney at EDELSON PC

350 North Lasalle Street, Ste 1300

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Brooke A.M. Taylor

Attorney at SUSMAN GODFREY (WA)

1201 Third Ave, Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Robert Rivera

Attorney at SUSMAN GODFREY (WA)

1201 Third Ave, Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

Erin Lindsay Calkins

Attorney at SUSMAN GODFREY (WA)

1201 Third Ave, Ste 3800

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Churchill Downs Incorporated INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT. REPOSTED AS DOCUMENT #2 (Receipt # 0981-3984627) Attorney Clifford A Cantor added to party Cheryl Kater(pty:pla), filed by Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) Modified on 4/17/2015 to edit text regarding reposting of complete complaint. (PM). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Churchill Downs Incorporated, filed by Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) (Fee Paid: 0981-3984627) Modified on 4/17/2015 to edit payment status (PM). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (MKB) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Churchill Downs Incorporated on 4/22/2015, filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

#5

(#5) PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit A re 2 Complaint by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin Lindsay Calkins on behalf of Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time to File Answer by parties re 2 Complaint (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Churchill Downs Incorporated (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brooke A.M. Taylor on behalf of Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#35

(#35) REPLY, filed by Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated, TO RESPONSE to 24 MOTION to Dismiss (Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#36

(#36) Stipulated MOTION by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. Noting Date 10/14/2015, (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

#37

(#37) ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Motion re plaintiff's deadline to file motion for class certification; Court continues plaintiff's deadline to file a motion for class certification until parties' initial status conference, during which parties can discuss a briefing schedule and submit proposals in their joint status report, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#39

(#39) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting defendant's 24 Motion to Dismiss. Court dismisses this case with prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#40

(#40) JUDGMENT BY COURT dismissing action with prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#41

(#41) MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/3/2015, (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

#42

(#42) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman denying plaintiff's 41 Motion for Reconsideration. (PM) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#43

(#43) NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 40 Judgment by Court, 42 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4289522. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 40 Judgment by Court, 42 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-4289522. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman denying plaintiff's 41 Motion for Reconsideration. (PM) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/3/2015, (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) JUDGMENT BY COURT dismissing action with prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting defendant's 24 Motion to Dismiss. Court dismisses this case with prejudice. (PM) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER granting 36 Stipulated Motion re plaintiff's deadline to file motion for class certification; Court continues plaintiff's deadline to file a motion for class certification until parties' initial status conference, during which parties can discuss a briefing schedule and submit proposals in their joint status report, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) (Entered: 10/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Stipulated MOTION by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. Noting Date 10/14/2015, (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) REPLY, filed by Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated, TO RESPONSE to 24 MOTION to Dismiss (Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. 33 Stipulation regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Other Deadlines filed by Churchill Downs Incorporated (RM) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 Stipulation extending time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint to June 30, 2015 filed by Churchill Downs Incorporated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brooke A.M. Taylor on behalf of Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (Taylor, Brooke) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Churchill Downs Incorporated (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time to File Answer by parties re 2 Complaint (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin Lindsay Calkins on behalf of Defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (Calkins, Erin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit A re 2 Complaint by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Churchill Downs Incorporated on 4/22/2015, filed by Plaintiff Cheryl Kater. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to defendant Churchill Downs Incorporated. (MKB) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Churchill Downs Incorporated, filed by Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) (Fee Paid: 0981-3984627) Modified on 4/17/2015 to edit payment status (PM). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Churchill Downs Incorporated INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT. REPOSTED AS DOCUMENT #2 (Receipt # 0981-3984627) Attorney Clifford A Cantor added to party Cheryl Kater(pty:pla), filed by Cheryl Kater. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) Modified on 4/17/2015 to edit text regarding reposting of complete complaint. (PM). (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less