This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:02:24 (UTC).

Karn v. National Credit Systems Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/07/2014 Karn filed an Other lawsuit against National Credit Systems Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-02480

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Karn

Defendant

National Credit Systems Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Panvini

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave., Ste. D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Russell Snow Thompson, IV

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave., Ste. D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorney

Charity A Olson

Attorney at Olson Law Group

2723 S State St., Ste. 150

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-11049370 filed by Ronald Karn. (submitted by Russell Thompson) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Ronald Karn. (submitted by Russell Thompson) (REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11049370. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02480-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/10/2014)

#5

(#5) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

#6

(#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald Karn: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon National Credit Systems, Inc. on 12/22/2014. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#7

(#7) *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to National Credit Systems, Inc. by Ronald Karn. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Panvini, Joseph) *Modified from Motion on 3/27/2015* (REW). (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#8

(#8) *** STRICKEN by (Doc. 20 ) *** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (REW) Modified on 6/15/2015 (KGM). (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Charity A. Olson by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#23

(#23) STATUS REPORT by Ronald Karn. (Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by National Credit Systems Incorporated.(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#20

(#20) ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default (Doc. 17 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the entry of default (Doc. 8 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/15.(KGM) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER - Scheduling Conference is set for 7/24/2015 at 8:45 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#17

(#17) Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/14/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Status Report on or before June 18, 2015 or this matter may be dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's Order without further notice on June 19, 2015. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/11/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STATUS REPORT by Ronald Karn. (Panvini, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by National Credit Systems Incorporated.(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default (Doc. 17 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the entry of default (Doc. 8 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/15.(KGM) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER - Scheduling Conference is set for 7/24/2015 at 8:45 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 06/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Status Report on or before June 18, 2015 or this matter may be dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's Order without further notice on June 19, 2015. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/11/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/2015. (KFZ) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-14-2480-PHX-GMS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for June 15, 2015 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Charity A. Olson by National Credit Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Olson, Charity) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *** STRICKEN by (Doc. 20 ) *** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (REW) Modified on 6/15/2015 (KGM). (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to National Credit Systems, Inc. by Ronald Karn. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Panvini, Joseph) *Modified from Motion on 3/27/2015* (REW). (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald Karn: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon National Credit Systems, Inc. on 12/22/2014. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to National Credit Systems Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11049370. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-02480-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Ronald Karn. (submitted by Russell Thompson) (REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-11049370 filed by Ronald Karn. (submitted by Russell Thompson) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.