This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:26:33 (UTC).

Kaplowitz v. Premera Blue Cross

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 Kaplowitz filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Premera Blue Cross. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00512

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ricardo S Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Kaplowitz

Defendant

Premera Blue Cross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert A Lubitz

Attorney at KANTROWITZ, GOLDHAMER & GRAIFMAN, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Clifford A Cantor

627 208Th Ave Se

Sammamish, WA 98074-7033

Patrick Slyne

Attorney at STULL STULL & BRODY (NY)

6 E 45 St, Ste 500

New York, NY 10017

Gary S Graifman

Attorney at KANTROWITZ, GOLDHAMER & GRAIFMAN, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross (Receipt # 0981-3965019) Attorney Clifford A Cantor added to party Howard Kaplowitz(pty:pla), filed by Howard Kaplowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz re 1 Complaint, on Attorney General Bob Ferguson (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross. (ST) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary S Graifman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3972728 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A Lubitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3972742 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary S Graifman for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A Lubitz for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings as related to C15-413RSM. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C15-512RSM; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman (RM) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER STAYING CASES pending MDL Panel's determination on transfer and consolidation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick Slyne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3982971 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick Slyne for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Premera Blue Cross on 4/7/2015, filed by Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick Slyne on behalf of Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz. (Slyne, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

#14

(#14) MDL 2633 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; District of Oregon; assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. Clerk transferred case electronically through CM/ECF. (PM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2015: # 1 Email re transfer of case) (PM). (Entered: 06/25/2015)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MDL 2633 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; District of Oregon; assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. Clerk transferred case electronically through CM/ECF. (PM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2015: # 1 Email re transfer of case) (PM). (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick Slyne on behalf of Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz. (Slyne, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Premera Blue Cross on 4/7/2015, filed by Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick Slyne for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick Slyne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3982971 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER STAYING CASES pending MDL Panel's determination on transfer and consolidation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings as related to C15-413RSM. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C15-512RSM; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman (RM) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A Lubitz for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary S Graifman for Howard Kaplowitz, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A Lubitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3972742 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary S Graifman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3972728 (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross. (ST) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Howard Kaplowitz re 1 Complaint, on Attorney General Bob Ferguson (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross (Receipt # 0981-3965019) Attorney Clifford A Cantor added to party Howard Kaplowitz(pty:pla), filed by Howard Kaplowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less