This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 05:30:29 (UTC).

Kamalov v. Center City Transportation Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Kamalov filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Center City Transportation Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-02635

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anashon Kamalov

Defendants

Center City Transportation Inc.

Zoly Locsh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abdul Karim Hassan

Attorney at Abdul Hassan Law Group, PLLC

215-28 Hillside Avenue

Queens Village, NY 11427

Defendant Attorney

Thomas A. Bizzaro

Attorney at Smith Mazure Director Wilkins Young & Yagerman PC

111 John Street

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/18/2015. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Center City Transportation Inc., Zoly Locsh. (Bizzaro, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anashon Kamalov. Zoly Locsh served on 5/22/2015, answer due 6/12/2015. (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anashon Kamalov (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anashon Kamalov. Center City Transportation Inc. served on 5/8/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7725009 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Anashon Kamalov. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A review of the docket sheet in this case reveals that the complaint was served on defendants on May 8, 2015 (Center City Transportion Inc.) and May 22, 2015 (Zoly Locsh), that defendants answers to the complaint were due on May 29 and June 12, 2015, and that no answer has been filed or any further action taken in the case. Plaintiff is now directed to show cause, in writing, by August 19, 2015, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Failure to comply with this Order shall result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed. The Clerk is requested to send a copy of this Order via ECF to counsel for plaintiff, who shall promptly serve copies on defendants. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2015. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Bizzaro on behalf of Center City Transportation Inc., Zoly Locsh (aty to be noticed) (Bizzaro, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2015 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/18/2015. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anashon Kamalov (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Center City Transportation Inc., Zoly Locsh. (Bizzaro, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Bizzaro on behalf of Center City Transportation Inc., Zoly Locsh (aty to be noticed) (Bizzaro, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A review of the docket sheet in this case reveals that the complaint was served on defendants on May 8, 2015 (Center City Transportion Inc.) and May 22, 2015 (Zoly Locsh), that defendants answers to the complaint were due on May 29 and June 12, 2015, and that no answer has been filed or any further action taken in the case. Plaintiff is now directed to show cause, in writing, by August 19, 2015, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Failure to comply with this Order shall result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed. The Clerk is requested to send a copy of this Order via ECF to counsel for plaintiff, who shall promptly serve copies on defendants. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2015. (Maynard, Pat) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anashon Kamalov. Zoly Locsh served on 5/22/2015, answer due 6/12/2015. (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anashon Kamalov. Center City Transportation Inc. served on 5/8/2015, answer due 5/29/2015. (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 05/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7725009 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Anashon Kamalov. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Hassan, Abdul) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.