This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2016 at 13:42:25 (UTC).

Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. et al v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2014 Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith and Judge Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:14-CV-06011

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith

Judge

Judge Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S. Danihel Collission, Inc.

Defendants

Affirmative Insurance Company

USAA General Indemnity Company

Travelers Commercial Insurance Company

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida

Westfield Insurance Company

Country Preferred Insurance Company

Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company

Government Employee's Insurance Company

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Unique Insurance Company

Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Encompass Property & Casualty Co

LM Insurance Corporation

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

Property and Casualty Company of Hartford

LM General Insurance Company

First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey R. Seewald

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC-Houston

Suite 1500, 1001 Mckinney

Houston, TX 77002

Anthony J. Rollo

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

301 Main Street, 14Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Steven F. Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Suite 3600, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Franklin G. Burt

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Suite 400 E, 1025 Thomas Jefferson St Nw

Washington, DC 20007-5208

William James Kelly, III

Attorney at Kelly & Walker LLC

1401 17Th St

Denver, CO 80202

Kimberly J. Donovan

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US), LLP

Suite 4700, 200 S Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33131-2398

Ian Matthew Fischer

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Jamie L. Halavais

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Richard L. Fenton

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

Suite 7800, 233 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

Marjorie M. Salazar

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

Suite 1447, 815 Walker St

Houston, TX 77002

Michael R. Pennington

Attorney at Bradley, Arant, Boult & Cummings, LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

Other Attorneys

Michael Sean McCarthy

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels, LLP

Suite 3200, 1700 Lincoln St

Denver, CO 80203-4532

Michael P. Kenny

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

Suite 4200, 1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Jeffrey S. Cashdan

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Tiffany L. Powers

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

Suite 4200, 1201 W Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

James Michael Jones

Attorney at Jones Day

Suite 4500, 500 Grand St

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Julius F. Parker, III

Attorney at Butler Pappas, LLP

Suite 101, 3600 Maclay Blvd S

Tallahassee, FL 32312-1267

Joseph R. Coburn

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114-1190

Bonnie Lau

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Kymberly Kochis

Attorney at Nelson Brown & Co

29Th Floor, 17 State Street

New York, NY 10004

59 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Michael Lee McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#135

(#135) MOTION to Strike 130 Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#131

(#131) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Hannay on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Hannay, William) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. dba Broadway Collission Center, Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc., Knebel Autobody Center, Inc. by Elaine Ryan (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2014)

#133

(#133) ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#129

(#129) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2014)

#132

(#132) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#127

(#127) NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine(Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (JET). (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#128

(#128) ORDER granting 37 motion to dismiss; granting 38 motion to dismiss; terminating 119 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division.(as, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion to stay 6 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. The Court was advised that the MDL Panel has granted a Conditional Transfer Order. Motion to stay 6 is stricken as moot. Status hearing set for 01/28/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 12/02/2014)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Brent R. Austin (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) MOTION to Strike 130 Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Yohai, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER granting (237) Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to GEICO Defendants' attorney's fee motions( Responses due by 11/3/2015) in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/7/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Klinger, Gary) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Hannay on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Hannay, William) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Illinois market share report, # 2 Exhibit national market share report, # 3 Exhibit California BAR report, # 4 Exhibit USAA parts brochure, # 5 Exhibit article, # 6 Exhibit unpaid procedures, # 7 Exhibit affidavit, # 8 Exhibit Consent Decree)(Fry, Allison) (Entered: 09/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) ORDER in case 6:14-cv-00310-GAP-TBS; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cynthia M Locke terminated in case 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS and related cases in which she has appeared. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/18/2015. Associated Cases: 6:14-md-02557-GAP-TBS et al.(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER granting 37 motion to dismiss; granting 38 motion to dismiss; terminating 119 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint by September 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/17/2015. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) NOTICE of change of address by Joshua Grabel and Dan W. Goldfine(Grabel, Joshua) Modified on 8/3/2015 (JET). (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) RESPONSE to 124 omnibus objections to 119 Report and Recommendations filed by 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, 21st Century North American Insurance Company, AIG Property Casualty Company, Affirmative Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Apollo Casualty Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Country Casualty Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, Country Preferred Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Encompass Home And Auto Insurance Company, Erie Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Farmers Automobile Management Corporation, First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc., Grange Indemnity Insurance Company, Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Harleysville Lake States Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois (Illinois), Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Illinois Farmers Insurance Company, Kemper Independence Insurance Company, LM General Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Mercury Insurance Company of Illinois, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Company of Hartford, Safe Auto Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Safeway Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, USAA General Indemnity Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Response - List of Defendants)(Caldwell, Lori) Modified on 7/17/2015 (JET). (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division the electronic record. (as, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] Modified on 12/9/2014 (IGC). (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Middle District of Florida, Orlando Division.(as, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. The Court was advised that the MDL Panel has granted a Conditional Transfer Order. Motion to stay 6 is stricken as moot. Status hearing set for 01/28/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 12/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion to stay 6 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Brent R. Austin (Austin, Brent) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Michael Lee McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. dba Broadway Collission Center, Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc., Knebel Autobody Center, Inc. by Elaine Ryan (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Knebel Autobody Center, Inc., Mitchell's Motors, Inc., Blue Island Broadway Auto Rebuilders, Inc. dba Broadway Collission Center, Douglas Autobody, Inc., S. Danihel Collission, Inc., Collision Craft Auto Body & Frame, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10039811. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Elaine) [Transferred from ilnd on 12/4/2014.] (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.