This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 15:59:32 (UTC).

June Medical Services LLC et al v. Caldwell et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2014 June Medical Services LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Caldwell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00525

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bossier City Medical Suite

John Doe 1

Choice Inc. of Texas

June Medical Services LLC

John Doe 2

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Delta Clinic of Baton Rouge, Inc.

John Doe 5

Women's Health Care Center, Inc.

John Doe 6

Defendants

Mark Henry Dawson

Kathy Kliebert

James David Caldwell

Jimmy Guidry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Brown

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Dimitra Doufekias

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 6000

Washington, DC 20006-1888

William E. Rittenberg

Attorney at Rittenberg & Samuel, LLC

715 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130-3505

Ilene Jaroslaw

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Janet Crepps

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Zoe Levine

Attorney at Center for Reproductive Rights

199 Water Street, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas M. McEachin

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Ellie T. Schilling

Attorney at Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

Ralph H. Wall

Attorney at Adams & Reese - N.O.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

S. Kyle Duncan

Attorney at Duncan PLLC

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Philip O. Bergeron

Attorney at Adams & Reese - N.O.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Don S. McKinney

Attorney at Adams & Reese - N.O.

One Shell Square - Suite 4500, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Steven H. Aden

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

440 First Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

J. Michael Johnson

Attorney at Kitchens Law FIrm

2250 Hospital Drive, Suite 248

Bossier City, LA 71111

Charlotte Y. Bergeron

1557 Pelham Drive

Baton Rouge, LA 70815

Natalie Decker

Attorney at Alliance Defending Freedom

7951 E. Maplewood, Suite 100

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Angelique Duhon Freel

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice - B.R.

P.O. Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Jessica Marie Podewils Thornhill

Attorney at Louisiana Dept. Of Justice

Po Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804

Emily Andrews

Attorney at Department of Justice, State of Louisiana

P.O. Box 94005, 1885 North 3Rd St

Baton Rouge, LA 94005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1117501.), filed by June Medical Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Summons to Defendant James David Caldwell, # 4 Summons to Defendant Jimmy Guidry, # 5 Summons to Defendant Mark Henry Dawson)(Rittenberg, William) Modified to edit text on 8/22/2014 (SMG). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Dimitra Doufekias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-1117518) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dimitra Doufekias, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Ilene Jaroslaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-1117522) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ilene Jaroslaw, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A: Prior Protective Order, # 3 Declaration of John Doe 1, M.D., # 4 Declaration of John Doe 2, M.D., # 5 Declaration of John Doe 3, M.D., # 6 Declaration of John Doe 4, M.D., # 7 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit H.B. 388, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Kathaleen Pittman, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Gross, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 1, M.D., # 6 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 2, M.D., # 7 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 3, M.D., # 8 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher M. Estes, M.D., M.P.H., # 9 Exhibit Summary of Hospital Admitting Privilege Requirements)(Rittenberg, William). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/22/2014 (SMG). Modified to edit motion text on 8/22/2014 (SMG). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Dimitra Doufekias to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/22/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Ilene Jaroslaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/22/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#9

(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2014. Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. (Recorded) (KDC) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#232

(#232) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 229 MOTION for Expedited Hearing MOTION to Stay Judgment and Ruling Pending Appeal, for Expedited Consideration, and for Temporary Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#231

(#231) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2016 at the request of the parties. For oral reasons assigned, Defendant's request for a temporary stay of the preliminary injunction is DENIED. The Court will hear arguments from Plaintiffs by written briefs to Defendant's 229 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 2/12/2016. Counsel for Defendant advised the Court that he did not wish to file any briefs on this motion. The Court advised the parties that a ruling will then be issued. (LLH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#230

(#230) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bossier City Medical Suite, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC for proceedings held on 02/10/2016 before Judge John W. deGravelles.. (Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#229

(#229) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, for Expedited Consideration, and for Temporary Stay by Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Stay Pending Appeal, Expedited Consideration, and Temporary Stay)(Duncan, S.). Modified to edit text on 2/10/2016 (BCL). (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#228

(#228) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA for the 5th Circuit of 227 Judgment,,, 216 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,,,,, by Kathy Kliebert. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 053N-1359739. (Duncan, S.) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#227

(#227) JUDGMENT: Defendant Kathy H. Kliebert and her successors, as well as any and all employees, agents, entities, or other persons acting in concert with her, are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing LA. R.S. 40:1299.35.2 et seq. against the following persons: Doctor John Doe 1; Doctor John Doe 2; June Medical Services, LLC, d/b/a Hope Medical Group for Women, and its physicians and staff; Bossier City Medical Suite, as well as its physicians and staff; Choice, Inc. of Texas, d/b/a Causeway Medical Clinic, and its physicians andstaff, including Doctor John Doe 4; and any and all others encompassed by the Parties' stipulations. This injunction will remain in effect until further notice from this Court or the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/10/2016. (BCL) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#226

(#226) ORDER approving 224 Joint Stipulation, filed by Bossier City Medical Suite, John Doe 1, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/05/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#225

(#225) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Status Conference hearing before Judge John W. deGravelles held on 1/29/16. Court Reporter: Janice Russell. Phone Number: (757) 422-9089; e-mail: trussell31@tdsmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.lamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (Russell, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#224

(#224) Joint STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Regarding the Court's January 26, 2016 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Bossier City Medical Suite, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC. (Rittenberg, William) Modified on 2/2/2016 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

241 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#232) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 229 MOTION for Expedited Hearing MOTION to Stay Judgment and Ruling Pending Appeal, for Expedited Consideration, and for Temporary Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#231) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2016 at the request of the parties. For oral reasons assigned, Defendant's request for a temporary stay of the preliminary injunction is DENIED. The Court will hear arguments from Plaintiffs by written briefs to Defendant's 229 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 2/12/2016. Counsel for Defendant advised the Court that he did not wish to file any briefs on this motion. The Court advised the parties that a ruling will then be issued. (LLH) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#230) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Bossier City Medical Suite, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC for proceedings held on 02/10/2016 before Judge John W. deGravelles.. (Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#229) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal, for Expedited Consideration, and for Temporary Stay by Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Stay Pending Appeal, Expedited Consideration, and Temporary Stay)(Duncan, S.). Modified to edit text on 2/10/2016 (BCL). (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#228) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the USCA for the 5th Circuit of 227 Judgment,,, 216 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,,,,,,,,, by Kathy Kliebert. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 053N-1359739. (Duncan, S.) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) JUDGMENT: Defendant Kathy H. Kliebert and her successors, as well as any and all employees, agents, entities, or other persons acting in concert with her, are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing LA. R.S. 40:1299.35.2 et seq. against the following persons: Doctor John Doe 1; Doctor John Doe 2; June Medical Services, LLC, d/b/a Hope Medical Group for Women, and its physicians and staff; Bossier City Medical Suite, as well as its physicians and staff; Choice, Inc. of Texas, d/b/a Causeway Medical Clinic, and its physicians andstaff, including Doctor John Doe 4; and any and all others encompassed by the Parties' stipulations. This injunction will remain in effect until further notice from this Court or the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/10/2016. (BCL) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) ORDER approving 224 Joint Stipulation, filed by Bossier City Medical Suite, John Doe 1, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 02/05/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#225) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Status Conference hearing before Judge John W. deGravelles held on 1/29/16. Court Reporter: Janice Russell. Phone Number: (757) 422-9089; e-mail: trussell31@tdsmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have five (5) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.lamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (Russell, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) Joint STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Regarding the Court's January 26, 2016 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Bossier City Medical Suite, Choice Inc. of Texas, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, June Medical Services LLC. (Rittenberg, William) Modified on 2/2/2016 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#223) ORDER granting 218 Motion to Enroll as counsel for the Defendant. S.Kyle Duncan, who is already enrolled as counsel for the Defendant, will continue torepresent the Defendant as lead trial counsel under the authority of the LouisianaAttorney General. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
211 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Enroll S. Kyle Duncan as Attorney for Defendant Jimmy Guidry by Jimmy Guidry. (Duncan, S.) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2014. Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. (Recorded) (KDC) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Ilene Jaroslaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/22/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Dimitra Doufekias to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/22/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit H.B. 388, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Kathaleen Pittman, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Gross, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 1, M.D., # 6 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 2, M.D., # 7 Exhibit Declaration of John Doe 3, M.D., # 8 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher M. Estes, M.D., M.P.H., # 9 Exhibit Summary of Hospital Admitting Privilege Requirements)(Rittenberg, William). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/22/2014 (SMG). Modified to edit motion text on 8/22/2014 (SMG). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A: Prior Protective Order, # 3 Declaration of John Doe 1, M.D., # 4 Declaration of John Doe 2, M.D., # 5 Declaration of John Doe 3, M.D., # 6 Declaration of John Doe 4, M.D., # 7 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Ilene Jaroslaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-1117522) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ilene Jaroslaw, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Dimitra Doufekias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-1117518) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dimitra Doufekias, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rittenberg, William) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1117501.), filed by June Medical Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Summons to Defendant James David Caldwell, # 4 Summons to Defendant Jimmy Guidry, # 5 Summons to Defendant Mark Henry Dawson)(Rittenberg, William) Modified to edit text on 8/22/2014 (SMG). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/22/2014) (SMG). (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.