This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 11:50:34 (UTC).

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 JUDICIAL WATCH, INC filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF STATE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Royce C. Lamberth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01739

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Royce C. Lamberth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramona Raula Cotca

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

425 Third Street, Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant Attorney

Marsha Stelson Edney

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 883

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

1 #4

Summons State Department

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 6 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 4, 2016.(lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

#2

(#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.

1 #3

Summons U.S. Attorney General

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#1

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 04/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 6 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 4, 2016.(lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/26/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4284635) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons State Department)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.