This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 08:55:46 (UTC).

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Case Summary

On 11/21/2014 JUDICIAL WATCH, INC filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01971

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

Defendant

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren M. Burke

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

425 Third Street, Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Paul J. Orfanedes

Attorney at JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.

425 Third Street, Sw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Lanier Kade

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Summons DOJ

1 #3

Summons U.S. Attorney General

1 #2

Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren M. Burke, :Firm- Judicial Watch, Inc., :Address- 425 3rd Street, SW Washington, D.C. 20024. Phone No. - 202-646-5194. Fax No. - 202-646-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3917157. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/31/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/01/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/1/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Pleading by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff on or before March 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/2/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULE OF PRODUCTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#10

(#10) STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULE OF PRODUCTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#11

(#11) STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULE OF PRODUCTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATUS REPORT AND SCHEDULE OF PRODUCTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff on or before March 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/2/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Pleading by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/1/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/31/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/01/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/1/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren M. Burke, :Firm- Judicial Watch, Inc., :Address- 425 3rd Street, SW Washington, D.C. 20024. Phone No. - 202-646-5194. Fax No. - 202-646-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3917157. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3913776) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less