This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2018 at 18:00:24 (UTC).

Joseph Tierney v. Moschino S.p.A. et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2015 Joseph Tierney filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Moschino S p A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05900

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Joseph Tierney

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Does 1-10, inclusive

Moschino S.p.A.

Jeremy Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Erikson

Attorney at Erikson Law Group

200 North Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

S Ryan Patterson

Attorney at JT Legal Group

801 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1130

Glendale, CA 91203

Antoinette S Waller

Attorney at Erikson Law Group

4004 Elderbank Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90031

Jeffrey S Gluck

Attorney at Gluck Law Group

123 N Kings Road Suite 6

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles J Veverka

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan PLLC

1389 Center Drive Suite 300

Park City, UT 84098

Tyson K Hottinger

Attorney at Maschoff Brennand Laycock Gilmore Israelsen and Wright PLLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 1200

Irvine, CA 92618

Quincy Justin Chuck

Attorney at Maschoff Brennan PLLC

20 Pacifica Suite 1130

Irvine, CA 92618

Mark W Ford

1389 Center Drive Suite 300

Park City, UT 84098

John Tehranian

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., East Tower, Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Peter R Afrasiabi

One Llp, East Tower, 4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

72 #1

Order of dismissal

#72

(#72) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

71 #1

Order of dismissal

#71

(#71) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

#70

(#70) STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

#69

(#69) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

56 #6

Proposed Order/Judgment

56 #5

Declaration of John Tehranian

56 #4

Declaration of Elizabeth Mattie

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney, (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Moschino S.p.A., Jeremy Scott. (pj) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • (#74) IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The further status conference scheduled for 12/19/2016 at 1:30 PM is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR, as it was set in error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • (#73) SCHEDULING NOTICE A Further Status Conference is set for 1/9/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S) (Entered: 07/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: In light of the notice of settlement, and the response thereto, the hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment #56 is continued to August 15, 2016. A status conference regarding the settlement is set for July 25, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are advised that the motion hearing and the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss is filed no later than July 22, 2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) RESPONSE filed by Defendant Moschino S.p.A.to Notice of Settlement #66 (Veverka, Charles) (Entered: 06/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 06/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Jeremy Scott filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney.(Patterson, S) (Entered: 06/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney, upon Defendant Jeremy Scott served on 9/8/2015, answer due 9/29/2015. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Moschino S.p.A., Jeremy Scott. (pj) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney, (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16208156 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney S Ryan Patterson added to party Joseph Tierney(pty:pla))(Patterson, S) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less