This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 19:51:59 (UTC).

Joseph Neev v. Alcon Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2015 Joseph Neev filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alcon Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ruttenberg IP Law, a Professional Corporation

Defendant

Wavelight, GmbH

Counter Defendants

Joseph Neev

LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC

Counter Claimant

Alcon Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

John Robert Lanham

Chika Arakawa

Eric Martin Acker

Mary Prendergast

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Philip J Graves

Bassil George Madanat

Barbara A Mahoney

Guy Ruttenberg

Ivy Arai Tabbara

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15290889 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Guy Ruttenberg added to party Joseph Neev(pty:pla))(Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev, identifying none. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. Related Case(s): 8:14-cv-00660 (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#6

(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (twdb) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. King, for the reasons set forth on this order. (see document for details). Related Case No. SACV14-660 GHK (JEMx) (dro) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#62

(#62) STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:15-cv-01551-JVS-JCG and 8:15-cv-336-JVS-JCG filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Acker, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#63

(#63) MINUTES OF Interim Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer. The Court directs counsel to meet, confer and submit a stipulation adjusting claim construction dates forthwith. The Court grants counter-defendant Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC ten (10) days to file the indicated supplemental statement. Any response to the supplemental statement shall be filed within seven (7) days thereafter.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#64

(#64) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation 62 (mt) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#65

(#65) SUPPLEMENT to Statement 56 filed by Counter Defendant LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC. (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#66

(#66) STRICKEN by Entry No. 67 (IN CHAMBERS) Having been advised that the parties will be appearing in front of Magistrate Judge Gandhi on February 8, 2016 for a settlement conference (Docket No. 93), the Court continues the Pretrial Conference to February 16, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. All pretrial papers shall be filed not later than noon February 12, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 1/28/2016 (kt). (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#67

(#67) (IN CHAMBERS) The Court hereby STRIKES Docket Entry No. 66 as issued in error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#68

(#68) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mary Prendergast at mprendergast@mofo.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Prendergast, Mary) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#69

(#69) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Ex Parte Applications filed by Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH, Counter Claimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2016)

#70

(#70) MINUTES OF Scheduling/Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court ORDERS all actions consolidated through the Markman/Claim Construction hearing. The Court continues and sets the Markman/Claim Construction Hearing, for all actions, to August 22, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The Court sets a Status Conference regarding the terms to be construed for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report (including a date for a technology tutorial) by May 31, 2016. The Court CONTINUES/SETS the Scheduling Conference in the following cases for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. (See document for details.) The Court lifts any stay regarding discovery as discussed on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (mt) (Entered: 02/20/2016)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) MINUTES OF Scheduling/Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court ORDERS all actions consolidated through the Markman/Claim Construction hearing. The Court continues and sets the Markman/Claim Construction Hearing, for all actions, to August 22, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The Court sets a Status Conference regarding the terms to be construed for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report (including a date for a technology tutorial) by May 31, 2016. The Court CONTINUES/SETS the Scheduling Conference in the following cases for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. (See document for details.) The Court lifts any stay regarding discovery as discussed on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (mt) (Entered: 02/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Ex Parte Applications filed by Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH, Counter Claimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc.. (Acker, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mary Prendergast at mprendergast@mofo.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Prendergast, Mary) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) (IN CHAMBERS) The Court hereby STRIKES Docket Entry No. 66 as issued in error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) STRICKEN by Entry No. 67 (IN CHAMBERS) Having been advised that the parties will be appearing in front of Magistrate Judge Gandhi on February 8, 2016 for a settlement conference (Docket No. 93), the Court continues the Pretrial Conference to February 16, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. All pretrial papers shall be filed not later than noon February 12, 2016.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 1/28/2016 (kt). (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) SUPPLEMENT to Statement 56 filed by Counter Defendant LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC. (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation 62 (mt) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) MINUTES OF Interim Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer. The Court directs counsel to meet, confer and submit a stipulation adjusting claim construction dates forthwith. The Court grants counter-defendant Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC ten (10) days to file the indicated supplemental statement. Any response to the supplemental statement shall be filed within seven (7) days thereafter.Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lwag) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:15-cv-01551-JVS-JCG and 8:15-cv-336-JVS-JCG filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories, Inc., Wavelight, GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Acker, Eric) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) (IN CHAMBERS) The Court sets, with the agreement of counsel, a Technology Tutorial, for SATURDAY, 4/23/2016 at 8:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. King, for the reasons set forth on this order. (see document for details). Related Case No. SACV14-660 GHK (JEMx) (dro) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (twdb) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. Related Case(s): 8:14-cv-00660 (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev, identifying none. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15290889 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Neev. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Guy Ruttenberg added to party Joseph Neev(pty:pla))(Ruttenberg, Guy) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWRENCE LIVERMORE NATIONAL SECURITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bassil George Madanat

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Graves(Designation Retained)