This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2016 at 18:50:56 (UTC).

Jones et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2014 Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00273

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Stephanie M. Rose

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carlos Luna

Katie Jones

Defendant

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Z Marks

Attorney at MARKS LAW FIRM

4225 University Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50311

L. Ashley Zubal

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE

210 Walnut Street, Suite 793

Des Moines, IA 50309

Thomas J. Lyons, Jr.

Attorney at CONSUMER JUSTICE CENTER P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Defendant Attorneys

Alan D. Wingfield

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP (Richmond)

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

H. Scott Kelly

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP (Richmond)

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

John C. Lynch

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP (Virginia Beach)

222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Stephen R Eckley

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#40

#41

#42

#43

#44

#45

#46

#47

#48

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) STIPULATION For Dismissal With Prejudice by Katie Jones, Carlos Luna. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) TEXT ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. The Court has been advised that the parties have reached a settlement in this case. Therefore, the jury trial set for June 27, 2016, and the final pretrial conference set for June 6, 2016 are canceled. The parties are directed to file all closing documents on or before September 23, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/2/2015. (dm) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/11/2015. (jeb) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Jury Trial for this case shall be scheduled to begin June 27, 2016, at 09:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse, Des Moines, Iowa, before United States District Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated length is 3 days. A Final Pretrial Conference shall be held on June 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in the Des Moines Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 8/11/2015. (jeb) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) TEXT ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE: As discussed with and agreed to by counsel, the parties shall have until August 7, 2015, to complete discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/28/2015. (jeb) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/28/2015. Attorney Thomas Lyons appeared for plaintiffs. Attorneys Alan Wingfield & Scott Kelly appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Order extending discovery deadline to be entered. Defendant's counsel to email chambers information re potential trial date conflicts by 7/29/2015. Parties to inform chambers re status of settlement negotiations by 7/31/2015. Plaintiffs to file stipulated motion to amend complaint by 8/7/2015. Total Court Time: 30 minutes. (jeb) (Entered: 07/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Status Conference shall be held on July 28, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the telephonic conference, counsel shall call the court's conference line at 515-284-6265 and utilize access code 1-1-6-2-6-5. Counsel should note that the teleconference system will only accommodate four lines total for the parties and, therefore, make arrangements as necessary to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/7/2015. (jeb) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) TEXT ORDER granting 40 Second Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Completion Date. As requested, the deadline to complete discovery shall be extended to August 3, 2015. The deadline to file dispositive motions shall be extended to October 2, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 7/6/2015. (jeb) (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Scheduling Order/R16 Deadlines of Discovery Deadline and Dispositive Motion Deadline by Katie Jones, Carlos Luna.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/20/2015 (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 05/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER: A review of the docket reveals that Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement as required by Local Rule 7.1. Local Rule 7.1 requires that a disclosure statement be filed on the form attached to the Local Rules as appendix A (the form is also available on the courts website). Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, is given until September 16, 2014, to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 9/2/2014. (nsr) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 7 plaintiffs' second motion to enlarge time to respond to complaint. Defendant shall have to and including 8/29/2014 to move or plead in response to the complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/22/2014. (kln) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Katie Jones, Carlos Luna.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Marks, Samuel) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: ORDER granting 5 plaintiffs' motion to enlarge time to respond to complaint. The parties have agreed to an extension of time to answer. Defendant shall have to and including 8/22/2014 to respond to the complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ross A. Walters on 8/4/2014. (kln) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Katie Jones, Carlos Luna.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Marks, Samuel) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Luna, Katie Jones. Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 7/14/2014, answer due 8/4/2014. (Zubal, L.) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas J. Lyons. Signed by Clerk, Marge Krahn on 7/11/2014. (sk, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-2365204 Fee paid in the amount of $75. by Katie Jones, Carlos Luna.Motions referred to Ross A. Walters. (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-2363086., filed by Carlos Luna, Katie Jones. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 11/6/2014. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marks, Samuel) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Ashley Zubal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Z Marks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J Lyons, Jr