This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2021 at 01:50:09 (UTC).

Johnson v. Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson

Marques Andre Johnson

Defendants

Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc

BET Interactive, LLC

TMZ Productions, Inc.

Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.

Gannet Company, Inc.

Interactive One, LLC

Daily News, L.P.

iHeartMedia, Inc.

TTT West Coast, Inc.

Viacom International, Inc.

Barstool Sports, Inc.

Real Times Media, LLC

EHM Productions Inc.

CBS Interactive, Inc.

Townsquare Media, Inc.

Cheri Media LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald J. Drescher

Attorney at Ron Drescher & Associates

One Commerce Center, 1201 N. Orange Street, Suite 732

Wilmington, DE 19801-1186

George Bochetto

Peter R. Bryant

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas E. Hanson, Jr.

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jaya Kasibhatla

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Rudolf Koch

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christine Dealy Haynes

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Linda M. Burrow

Arwen Johnson

Joel R. Weiner

Arthur G. Connolly, III

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher LLP

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mark I. Bailen

James Romoser

Sara E. Bussiere

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

David J. Margules

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

919 North Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801-3034

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Elizabeth A. Sloan

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

919 North Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801-3034

Stephanie Habelow Dallaire

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph Benedict Cicero

Attorney at Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP

1313 N. Market Street, Suite 5400

Wilmington, DE 19801

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#53

#57

55 #1

Exhibit Proposed Form of Order

#55

#54

#52

#51

#50

#47

#46

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

39 #5

Text of Proposed Order

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Barstool Sports is hereby joined in the motion to dismiss (D.I. 28) and the motion is GRANTED in favor of Barstool Sports and the Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Barstool Sports. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/17. (ntl) (ntl). (Entered: 03/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Docket(#56) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a brief response, not to exceed two (2) single-spaced pages, setting out his position as to how the Court should proceed with respect to Defendant Barstool Sport Inc.'s Request to Join certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for it's Motion to be Granted (D.I. 55), no later than Monday, March 13, 2017. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/17. (ntl) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Letter to Chief Judge Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III regarding Barstool Sport Inc.'s Request to Join certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for it's Motion to be Granted - re #54 Order, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendants Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., TMZ Productions Inc., EHM Productions, Inc. and TTT West Coast, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Prejudice). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Form of Order)(Connolly, Arthur) (Entered: 02/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 02/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER re #53 Memorandum Opinion -- Defendants' motions to dismiss the original Complaint (D.I. 12, 16, 18, 19) are DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants' motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint (D.I. 27, 28, 30, and 33) are GRANTED based on the statute of limitations and DENIED AS MOOT in all other respects. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/17. (ntl) (Entered: 02/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MEMORANDUM OPINION re motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/14/17. (ntl) (Entered: 02/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #50 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 28, 2017 filed by Barstool Sports, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/17. (ntl) (Entered: 02/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Letter to Judge Stark from George Bochetto regarding Request for postponement - re 48 Order,, Set Hearings,. (Drescher, Ronald) (Entered: 02/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Townsquare Media, Inc. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to February 28, 2017 - filed by Barstool Sports, Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur) (Entered: 02/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Smith filed by Marques Andre Johnson. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/17/16. (ntl) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily Smith Lee - filed by Marques Andre Johnson. (Drescher, Ronald) (Entered: 05/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jaya Kasibhatla,James Rosenfeld for BET Interactive, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Rosenfeld filed by Gannet Company, Inc., Real Times Media, LLC, BET Interactive, LLC, Interactive One, LLC, CBS Interactive, Inc., Viacom International, Inc., Daily News, L.P., iHeartMedia, Inc., #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jaya Kasibhatla filed by Gannet Company, Inc., Real Times Media, LLC, CBS Interactive, Inc., Interactive One, LLC, BET Interactive, LLC, Viacom International, Inc., iHeartMedia, Inc., Daily News, L.P. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/16. (ntl) (Entered: 05/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Rosenfeld - filed by BET Interactive, LLC, CBS Interactive, Inc., Daily News, L.P., Gannet Company, Inc., Interactive One, LLC, Real Times Media, LLC, Viacom International, Inc., iHeartMedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Hanson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jaya Kasibhatla - filed by BET Interactive, LLC, CBS Interactive, Inc., Daily News, L.P., Gannet Company, Inc., Interactive One, LLC, Real Times Media, LLC, Viacom International, Inc., iHeartMedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Hanson, Thomas) (Entered: 05/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (cna) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cna) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against BET Interactive, LLC, Barstool Sports, Inc., CBS Interactive, Inc., Cheri Media LLC, Daily News, L.P., Gannet Company, Inc., Interactive One, LLC, Real Times Media, LLC, TMZ Productions, Inc., TTT West Coast, Inc., Townsquare Media, Inc., Viacom International, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., iHeartMedia, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1900304.) - filed by Marques Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cna) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAILY NEWS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Interactive One, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TMZ PRODUCTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Townsquare Media, Inc. is a litigant