This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:28:55 (UTC).

Johnson v. JP Morgan Chase

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Melinda Harmon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-01706

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Melinda Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmitt Johnson

Fresno, TX 77545

Defendant

JP Morgan Chase

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seth Crosland

Attorney at Crosland Law Firm

Po Box 298

Denton, TX 76202

Defendant Attorneys

Treyson J Brooks

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett And Moser

2001 Bryan St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

William Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander et al

2001 Bryan St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief in Support of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(thanniable, 4) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#22

(#22) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 11/18/2015(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JP Morgan Chase, filed.(Lewis, William) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13309151) filed by Emmitt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Continuance by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#29

(#29) RESPONSE in Opposition to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, filed by Emmitt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE to 27 MOTION for Reconsideration of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by JP Morgan Chase. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

#30

(#30) ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#25

(#25) ORDER Mooting entry 18 . (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#24

(#24) MOTION to Amend COMPLAINT by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDER denying 23 Motion for Continuance; denying 24 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Emmitt Johnson, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to JP Morgan Chase served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/24/2014 at 03:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Emmitt Johnson, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) RESPONSE in Opposition to 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support, filed by Emmitt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE to 27 MOTION for Reconsideration of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by JP Morgan Chase. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Reconsideration and Brief in Support of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(thanniable, 4) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER denying 23 Motion for Continuance; denying 24 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER Mooting entry 18 . (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Amend COMPLAINT by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Continuance by Emmitt Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 11/18/2015(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Brooks, Treyson) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Emmitt Johnson, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JP Morgan Chase, filed.(Lewis, William) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to JP Morgan Chase served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez) (Entered: 06/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/24/2014 at 03:45 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Emmitt Johnson, filed.(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13309151) filed by Emmitt Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crosland, Seth) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.