This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2016 at 13:37:18 (UTC).

Johnson v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Chief Judge James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02210

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry L Johnson

Clinton, IL 61727

Defendants

Danielle Lewellyn

Larry Thomason

Ryan Sparling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Kevin M Casey

Attorney at PETERSON JOHNSON & MURRAY CHICAGO LLC

Suite 2125, 200 W. Adams

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

#23

#24

#25

#26

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Dewitt County Sheriff's Department Response to Subpoena by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Danielle Lewellyn, Ryan Sparling (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danielle Lewellyn, Ryan Sparling (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Defendants' First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Danielle Lewellyn, Ryan Sparling (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Issue Subpoenas by Plaintiff Henry L Johnson. Responses due by 12/24/2015 (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendants' Initial Discovery to Plaintiff. (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendants' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Filing re 19 Answer to Complaint (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Danielle Lewellyn, Ryan Sparling.(Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 11/25/15. Discovery closes May 31, 2016. Dispositive Motions are due July 1, 2016. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is GRANTED, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to calculate and to collect the amount of the initial filing fee, if any, owed by Plaintiff. Plaintiff's motion for status 17 is DENIED as moot in light of this Order. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate)(FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Status and Motion for Copies filed by Plaintiff Henry L Johnson. Responses due by 12/7/2015 (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 11/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pi Sparlinl. Pi Sparlinl waiver sent on 10/16/2015, answer due 12/15/2015. (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kevin M Casey on behalf of Pi Sparlinl (Casey, Kevin) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Pi Sparlini along with a copy of the Complaint and Merit Review Order on 10/6/2015. (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 10/6/15. IT IS ORDERED: Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states an excessive force claim against Defendant R. Sparlinl and a deliberate indifference claim against Defendant Sparlinl and Defendant Jane Doe. This case proceeds solely on the claims identified in this paragraph. Any additional claim(s) shall not be included in the case except at the Court's discretion on a motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15.Plaintiff's Complaint fails to state a claim against Defendant Larry Thompson, and he is dismissed as party Defendant. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to: (1) attempt service on Defendant R. Sparlinl pursuant to the Courts standard procedures; (2) dismiss Defendant Larry Thompson; and (3) set an internal Court deadline 60 days from the entry of this Order for the Court to check on the status of service and enter scheduling deadlines.Lastly, it is ORDERED that, if a Defendant fails to sign and return a waiver of service to the Clerk within 30 days after the waiver is sent, the Court will take appropriate steps to effect formal service through the U.S. Marshal's Service on that Defendant and will require that Defendant to pay the full costs of formal service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d)(2).SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Henry L Johnson (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Trust Fund Letter to Vermilion County Jail requesting Trust Fund Ledgers from 3/22/15 through 9/22/15 as to Henry L. Johnson. (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Henry L Johnson. Responses due by 10/9/2015 (FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Henry L Johnson.(FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING.Merit Review Deadline 10/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Henry L Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(FDT, ilcd) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Mark Casey