This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 20:09:44 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. San Diego, County of et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2014 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against San Diego, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00616

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Larry Alan Burns

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zana Licht

Morgen Johnson

Defendants

Does 1-20

Kenneth Feistel

Richard Meharg

San Diego, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R Marrinan

Attorney at Michael R Marrinan, Attorney at Law

225 Broadway, Suite 1460

San Diego, CA 92101

Thomas Eugene Robertson

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas E. Robertson

225 Broadway, Suite 1460

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie E Kish

Attorney at County of San Diego Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2469

Joseph T Kutyla

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph T. Kutyla APC

501 West Broadway, Suite 2080

San Diego, CA 92101

Ronald Lenert

Attorney at County of San Diego Office of County Counsel

1600 Pacific Highway, Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2469

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6855673), filed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht.The new case number is 3:14-cv-616-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Marrinan, Michael)(dlg) (cap). (Entered: 03/18/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (cap). (Entered: 03/18/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. San Diego, County of served. (Marrinan, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2014 to edit text (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. Richard Meharg served. (Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. Kenneth Feistel served. (Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion to Amend. The complaint is deemed amended to correct the date of the incident on page 3, line 7 so as to read October 18, 2012, rather than October 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/2/14. (kaj) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kenneth Feistel, Richard Meharg, San Diego, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kish, Stephanie)Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party Kenneth Feistel(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party Richard Meharg(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party San Diego, County of(pty:dft)(kaj). (Entered: 04/10/2014)

#9

(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Marrinan, Michael)(kaj). (Entered: 04/27/2014)

#89

(#89) ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions in limine, ORDER denying Rule 50 motion. The parties should be prepared for jury selection on Monday, January 25, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The trial will commence with opening statements the next morning at 8:30 a.m.. The parties should expect the case to be submitted to the jury by Friday, January 29, and the trial will not be bifurcated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/14/16. (kas) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#90

(#90) Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom by Morgen Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael)(kas). (Entered: 01/18/2016)

#91

(#91) ORDER granting 85 Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/20/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas) Modified on 1/21/2016 to correct motion number (kas). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#92

(#92) ORDER granting plaintiff's 90 Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/20/16. (kas) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#93

(#93) NOTICE of TIME CHANGE: Jury Selection set for 1/25/2016 03:00 PM has been CHANGED to 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14A before Judge Larry Alan Burns. (no document attached) (tlw) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#94

(#94) OBJECTION by Kenneth Feistel, Richard Meharg To Plaintiff's Proposed Joint Statement Of The Case. (Lenert, Ronald) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#95

(#95) Minute Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns: Jury selection in this case will begin Monday, January 25, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. rather than at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should be prepared to make their opening statements immediately following jury selection, rather than Tuesday morning. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/21/2016. (Court Reporter/ECR N/Af). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance).(Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#96

(#96) Proposed Voir Dire by Morgen Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#97

(#97) NOTICE by Morgen Johnson of Filing Plaintiff's Proposed Special Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) NOTICE by Morgen Johnson of Filing Plaintiff's Proposed Special Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Proposed Voir Dire by Morgen Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Minute Order by Judge Larry Alan Burns: Jury selection in this case will begin Monday, January 25, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. rather than at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should be prepared to make their opening statements immediately following jury selection, rather than Tuesday morning. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/21/2016. (Court Reporter/ECR N/Af). (Plaintiff Attorney No appearance).(Defendant Attorney No appearance). (kas) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) OBJECTION by Kenneth Feistel, Richard Meharg To Plaintiff's Proposed Joint Statement Of The Case. (Lenert, Ronald) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) NOTICE of TIME CHANGE: Jury Selection set for 1/25/2016 03:00 PM has been CHANGED to 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14A before Judge Larry Alan Burns. (no document attached) (tlw) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) ORDER granting plaintiff's 90 Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/20/16. (kas) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) ORDER granting 85 Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/20/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas) Modified on 1/21/2016 to correct motion number (kas). (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom by Morgen Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael)(kas). (Entered: 01/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions in limine, ORDER denying Rule 50 motion. The parties should be prepared for jury selection on Monday, January 25, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The trial will commence with opening statements the next morning at 8:30 a.m.. The parties should expect the case to be submitted to the jury by Friday, January 29, and the trial will not be bifurcated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/14/16. (kas) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/14/16.(kas) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Accepting Amended Complaint as filed. If Defendant wishes the pending motion to dismiss to apply to the amended complaint, it may file a notice so stating, by May 1, 2014. If Defendant does so, the motion to dismiss will be deemed a motion to dismiss the amended complaint, and the current briefing schedule will remain in effect. If Defendant does not do so, the motion to dismiss will be denied as moot, and Defendant must timely respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/28/14.(kaj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Marrinan, Michael)(kaj). (Entered: 04/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kenneth Feistel, Richard Meharg, San Diego, County of. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kish, Stephanie)Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party Kenneth Feistel(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party Richard Meharg(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie E Kish added to party San Diego, County of(pty:dft)(kaj). (Entered: 04/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion to Amend. The complaint is deemed amended to correct the date of the incident on page 3, line 7 so as to read October 18, 2012, rather than October 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/2/14. (kaj) (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. Kenneth Feistel served. (Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. Richard Meharg served. (Marrinan, Michael) (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht. San Diego, County of served. (Marrinan, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2014 to edit text (kaj). (Entered: 04/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (cap). (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6855673), filed by Morgen Johnson, Zana Licht.The new case number is 3:14-cv-616-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Marrinan, Michael)(dlg) (cap). (Entered: 03/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less