This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 08:10:07 (UTC).

Johns Manville Corporation et al v. Knauf Insulation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 Johns Manville Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Knauf Insulation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00531

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johns Manville Corporation

Johns Manville

Defendants

Knauf Insulation, LLC

Knauf Insulation, SPRL

Khauf Insulation GmbH

Knauf Insulation Limited

Knauf Insulation, Inc.

Gebr. Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG

Walter A. Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Miranda C. Rogers

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Rachel Clark Hughey

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, PC-Minneapolis

80 South Eighth Street, Ids Center, Suite 3200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4131

Bruce Jefferson Boggs, Jr.

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, PC-Alexandria

1701 Duke Street, Suite 310

Alexandria, VA 22314

David E. Sipiora

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Samantha K. Picans

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Kevin Michael Bell

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Jeffrey Matthew Connor

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Duane Roger Denton

Attorney at Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP

10 West Market Street, Market Tower, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Perry L. Glantz

Attorney at Stinson Leonard Street LLP-Greenwood Village

6400 S. Fiddlers Green Circle,, Suite 1900

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Spiro Bereveskos

Attorney at Woodard Emhardt Moriarty McNett & Henry LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 3700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5137

Daniel J. Lueders

Attorney at Woodard Emhardt Moriarty McNett & Henry LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 3700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-5137

Bradley Robert Love

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP-Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3535

John R. Maley

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP-Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

James R. Sweeney, II

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP-Indianapolis

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gebr. Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG, Walter A. Johnson, Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation Limited, Knauf Insulation, LLC, Knauf Insulation, SPRL (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4313420)Attorney Bruce Jefferson Boggs, Jr added to party Johns Manville(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce Jefferson Boggs, Jr added to party Johns Manville Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation LLC re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walter A. Johnson re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation GmbH re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation, SPRL re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation Limited re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Gebr. Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#9

(#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (amenz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#106

(#106) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Trade Secret Contentions by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Bell, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#107

(#107) ORDER granting 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Trade Secret Contentions. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/2/16. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#108

(#108) STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal of Complaint by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#109

(#109) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin Bell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#110

(#110) BRIEF in Opposition to 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, filed by Defendants Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Bell Ltr. 2.8.2016)(Bereveskos, Spiro) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#111

(#111) JOINDER re 110 Brief in Opposition to Motion, 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, Walter A. Johnson's Joinder of Knauf Insulation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Defendant Walter A. Johnson. (Love, Bradley) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#112

(#112) REPLY to Response to 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#113

(#113) ORDER granting 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint. The Court directs the Plaintiffs to file a clean version of their First Amended Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/23/16. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#114

(#114) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walter A. Johnson, Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation, LLC, filed by Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation.(Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walter A. Johnson, Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation, LLC, filed by Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation.(Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) ORDER granting 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint. The Court directs the Plaintiffs to file a clean version of their First Amended Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/23/16. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) REPLY to Response to 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) JOINDER re 110 Brief in Opposition to Motion, 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, Walter A. Johnson's Joinder of Knauf Insulation's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Defendant Walter A. Johnson. (Love, Bradley) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) BRIEF in Opposition to 109 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, filed by Defendants Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Bell Ltr. 2.8.2016)(Bereveskos, Spiro) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kevin Bell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal of Complaint by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Sipiora, David) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) ORDER granting 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Trade Secret Contentions. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/2/16. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Trade Secret Contentions by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Bell, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) ORDER finding as moot 90 MOTION to Allow Time for Discovery Under Rule 56(D). Court finds this motion to be moot in light of the Notice at ECF No. 103. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/29/16. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (amenz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (amenz, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Gebr. Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation Limited re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation, SPRL re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation GmbH re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walter A. Johnson re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Knauf Insulation LLC re 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Gebr. Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG, Walter A. Johnson, Khauf Insulation GmbH, Knauf Insulation Limited, Knauf Insulation, LLC, Knauf Insulation, SPRL (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4313420)Attorney Bruce Jefferson Boggs, Jr added to party Johns Manville(pty:pla), Attorney Bruce Jefferson Boggs, Jr added to party Johns Manville Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Johns Manville, Johns Manville Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boggs, Bruce) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less