This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:13:39 (UTC).

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pink Street Pub, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2014 Joe Hand Promotions, Inc filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Pink Street Pub, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00883

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Susie Morgan

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.

Defendants

Debra A. Fontenot

Deanna Hardy

Pink Street Pub, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronnie J. Berthelot

Attorney at Berthelot Law Firm, LLC

1660 Thibodeaux Avenue

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorney

Matthew P. Chenevert

Attorney at Matthew Chenevert, Attorney at Law

23 Park Timbers Drive

New Orleans, LA 70131

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4420668) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)Attorney Ronnie J. Berthelot added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla).(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Debra A. Fontenot, Deanna Hardy, Pink Street Pub, LLC. (bwn) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Debra A. Fontenot served on 5/2/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

#6

(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Deanna Hardy. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#7

(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pink Street Pub, LLC. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

#8

(#8) SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Debra A. Fontenot by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

#13

(#13) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2014 10:00 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone.(cbn) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER:1st Status Conference set for 9/17/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. 2nd Status Conference set for 1/21/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2015 03:30 PM. Bench Trial set for 4/13/2015 09:00 AM. All discovery must be completed by 2/3/2015. Signed by clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Mag. Roby)(cbn) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#15

(#15) ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/2/2014.(caa) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

#16

(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 9/17/2014. (bwn) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#17

(#17) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Deanna Hardy. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#18

(#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pink Street Pub, LLC. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#19

(#19) Witness and Exhibit List by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#20

(#20) Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Chenevert, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

#21

(#21) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 20 Witness and Exhibit List - Case caption contains incorrect case number (2:14cv88). Please be sure to have correct case number on all future pleadings. No further action necessary. (bwn) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 20 Witness and Exhibit List - Case caption contains incorrect case number (2:14cv88). Please be sure to have correct case number on all future pleadings. No further action necessary. (bwn) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Chenevert, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Witness and Exhibit List by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 12/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pink Street Pub, LLC. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Deanna Hardy. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 9/17/2014. (bwn) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/2/2014.(caa) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER:1st Status Conference set for 9/17/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. 2nd Status Conference set for 1/21/2015 03:00 PM before Judge Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2015 03:30 PM. Bench Trial set for 4/13/2015 09:00 AM. All discovery must be completed by 2/3/2015. Signed by clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Mag. Roby)(cbn) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2014 10:00 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone.(cbn) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying 9 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by clerk. (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Service Attempts by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Debra A. Fontenot by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Pink Street Pub, LLC. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Deanna Hardy. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Debra A. Fontenot served on 5/2/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Debra A. Fontenot, Deanna Hardy, Pink Street Pub, LLC. (bwn) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4420668) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)Attorney Ronnie J. Berthelot added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla).(Berthelot, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.