This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 23:37:58 (UTC).

JETER v. TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2014 JETER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Madeline C. Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-05387

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Madeline C. Arleo

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge James B. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MARCUS JETER

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CAPT. GLEN WIEGAND

JOHN DOE CHIEFS AND SUPERVISORS 21-40

ALBERT SUTTERLIN

THOMAS ICOLARI

BLOOMFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

JOHN DOE PROSECUTORS

CHIEF CHRIS GOUL

DEVIA LOPEZ

SEAN COURTER

LT MICHAEL COFONE

ORLANDO TRINIDAD

XYZ PUBLIC ENTITY, COMPANY/CORPORATION 1-10

JANE DOES 40-60

LT. SEAN SCHWINDT

SGT. JOHN SERCHIO

JOHN DOE POLICE OFFICERS 1-20

TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD

MARCUS JETER

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

ALBERT SUTTERLIN

THOMAS ICOLARI

DEVIA LOPEZ

SEAN COURTER

LT MICHAEL COFONE

ORLANDO TRINIDAD

LT. SEAN SCHWINDT

SGT. JOHN SERCHIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

TRACEY C. HINSON

Attorney at HINSON SNIPES, LLP

116 Village Blvd., Suite 307, Suite 307

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

ALAN J. BARATZ

Attorney at WEINER LESNIAK

629 Parsippany Road, Post Office Box 438

Parsippany, NJ 07054-0438

BRENDA A. COPPOLA CUBA

324 East Broad Street, P.O. Box 2640

Westfield, NJ 07090-5726

NICHOLAS A. GRIECO

Attorney at GRIECO & DEFILIPPO, LLC

414 Eagle Rock Avenue, Suite 200

West Orange, NJ 07052

DANIEL J POMEROY

Attorney at Pomeroy, Heller & Ley, LLC

150 Morris Avenue

Springfield, NJ 07081

TIMOTHY P. BECK

Attorney at DIFRANCESCO, KUNZMAN, COLEY, YOSPIN, BERNSTEIN & BATEMAN, PC

15 Mountain Boulevard

Warren, NJ 07059-5686

THOMAS A. KEENAN

Attorney at KEENAN & DORIS, LLC

71 Union Avenue, Suite 105

Rutherford, NJ 07070

THOMAS B. HANRAHAN

Attorney at THOMAS B. HANRAHAN & ASSOCIATES, LLC

80 Grand Avenue, Suite #2

River Edge, NJ 07661

ROBERT F. RENAUD

Attorney at PALUMBO & RENAUD, ESQS.

190 North Avenue East

Cranford, NJ 07016

TRACEY C. HINSON

Attorney at HINSON SNIPES, LLP

116 Village Blvd., Suite 307, Suite 307

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD, GLEN WIEGAND, CHRIS GOUL from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-004088-14. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5896250), filed by TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD, GLEN WIEGAND, CHRIS GOUL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(anr) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

#2

(#2) Standing ORDER requiring submission of information regarding Removal by 9/16/14, etc. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 9/2/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

#3

(#3) Letter from Alan J. Baratz, Esq.. (BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BLOOMFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRIS GOUL, GLEN WIEGAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

#5

(#5) LETTER ORDER - Scheduling an Initial Conference for 10/27/2014 at 2:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/15/2014. (mw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#6

(#6) Request for Default by MARCUS JETER against Bloomfield Police Department, Orlando Trinidad, Sean Courter, Albert Sutterlin, Thomas Icolari, Lt. Sean Schwindt, Sgt. John Serchio, Lt. Michael Cofone, Devia Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(HINSON, TRACEY) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

#7

(#7) Letter from Alan J. Baratz. (BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

#8

(#8) TEXT ORDER - The initial conference scheduled for 10/27/2014 is adjourned until 12/1/2014 at 2:30PM. A joint discovery plan must be electronically filed on the docket by 11/25/2014. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/22/2014. (mw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS B. HANRAHAN on behalf of ORLANDO TRINIDAD (HANRAHAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

#68

(#68) Order

#67

(#67) Letter

#66

(#66) Letter

#65

(#65) Letter

#64

(#64) Letter

#63

(#63) Order

#62

(#62) Order

#61

(#61) Notice (Other)

#60

(#60) Letter

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Notice (Other)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Robert F. Renaud, Esq. re Clerk's Entry of Default,. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Order Vacating Default entered against Defendant Sierchio)(RENAUD, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS B. HANRAHAN on behalf of ORLANDO TRINIDAD (HANRAHAN, THOMAS) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER - The initial conference scheduled for 10/27/2014 is adjourned until 12/1/2014 at 2:30PM. A joint discovery plan must be electronically filed on the docket by 11/25/2014. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/22/2014. (mw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Alan J. Baratz. (BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Default by MARCUS JETER against Bloomfield Police Department, Orlando Trinidad, Sean Courter, Albert Sutterlin, Thomas Icolari, Lt. Sean Schwindt, Sgt. John Serchio, Lt. Michael Cofone, Devia Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(HINSON, TRACEY) (Entered: 10/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER ORDER - Scheduling an Initial Conference for 10/27/2014 at 2:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/15/2014. (mw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BLOOMFIELD POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRIS GOUL, GLEN WIEGAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Alan J. Baratz, Esq.. (BARATZ, ALAN) (Entered: 09/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Standing ORDER requiring submission of information regarding Removal by 9/16/14, etc. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 9/2/14. (jd, ) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD, GLEN WIEGAND, CHRIS GOUL from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-004088-14. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5896250), filed by TOWNSHIP OF BLOOMFIELD, GLEN WIEGAND, CHRIS GOUL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(anr) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.