This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 08:46:32 (UTC).

Jesus Alvarado et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2007 Jesus Alvarado filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle and Judge David O. Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:07-CV-00615

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle

Judge

Judge David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mariam S Jones

Jesus Alvarado

Clarence Sellers

Angelica Reyes

Christina Sellers

Alfredo Reyes

Sandra M Roth

Petitioners

U.S. Bank National Association, Successor in Interest to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Downey Savings and Loan Association, F.A.

U.S. Bank N.A.

PLAINTIFF Alfredo Reyes

Defendants

Does 1 through 200

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

Central Mortgage Company

U.S. Bank National Association

Downey Financial Corporation

Downey Savings & Loan Association F A

Does 2 through 200, inclusive

DOES

Receiver

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

David L Zifkin

Attorney at Boies Schiller and Flexner LLP

850 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 850

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Eric M George

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey K Berns

Attorney at Berns Weiss LLP

20700 Ventura Boulevard Suite 140

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Joshua H Haffner

Attorney at Kabateck Brown Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael A Bowse

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael C Eyerly

Attorney at Kiesel Boucher Larson LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Patrick A DeBlase

Attorney at Kiesel Boucher Larson LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Paul R Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Boucher Larson LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Evan M Zucker

Attorney at Kabatec Brown Kellner LLP

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

James Mark Moore

Attorney at Moore & Leviant LLP

20700 Ventura Blvd., Suite 140

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Seeger Weiss LLP

1515 Market Street Suite 1380

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Receiver Attorneys

Jeffrey K Berns

Attorney at Berns Weiss LLP

20700 Ventura Boulevard Suite 140

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Norma V Garcia

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Isaiah Zachary Weedn

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive, 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Petitioner, Defendant and Receiver Attorneys

Norma V Garcia

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Matthew A Hodel

Attorney at Hodel Briggs Winter LLP

8105 Irvine Center Drive Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92618

Michael A Wallin

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton

650 Town Center Drive, 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Albert J Tumpson

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALBERT J. TUMPSON

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 525

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David A Super

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2400

Robert S Beall

Ryan E Bull

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2400

Serena F Martinez

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation, Does 1 through 100 inclusive.(Filing fee $ 350), filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes.(dmjr) (Entered: 06/04/2007)

#2

(#2) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes. (dmjr) (Entered: 06/04/2007)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Sandra Gamelin; Related Case(s): SACV 07-612 AHS (FMOx) (esa) (Entered: 07/05/2007)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing original summons with Court Clerk filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes. (esa) (Entered: 07/10/2007)

#5

(#5) OPPOSITION to Notice of Related Case(s) 3 filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

#6

(#6) Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

#7

(#7) OPPOSITION to Notice of Related Cases filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes, upon Downey Financial Corporation served on 6/18/2007, answer due 7/8/2007. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by federal statute, upon John A MacDonald, Agent - by leaving with Stephanie Dodge, Admin Assistant. Due Diligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (klg) (Entered: 07/12/2007)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes, upon Downey Savings & Loan Association F A served on 6/18/2007, answer due 7/8/2007. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by federal statute, upon John A MacDonald, agent - by leaving with Stephanie Dodge, Admin assistsnt. Due Diligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (klg) (Entered: 07/12/2007)

#220

(#220) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read SACV 07-00615 DOC (MANx). (rn) (Entered: 09/23/2010)

#221

(#221) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Jesus Alvarado.. (Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2010)

#222

(#222) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle re Stipulation for Protective Order 219 (ec) (Entered: 10/07/2010)

#223

(#223) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The matter is called. Counsel state their appearances. The Court conducts the Scheduling Conference. The Court sets the following case management dates: (See document for details). Set deadlines and hearings: Discovery cut-off 8/15/2011; Motions due by 10/11/2011 at 8:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter; Jury Trial set for 1/17/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (wr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)

#224

(#224) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: This Pretrial Scheduling Order governs the course of all pretrial proceedings in this case. For further guidance, consult the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. (See Order for details). (wr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)

#225

(#225) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Jonathan Shub on behalf of Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth. Filed by Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/03/2010)

#226

(#226) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney J. Mark Moore on behalf of Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth. Filed by Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth (Moore, J) (Entered: 12/03/2010)

#227

(#227) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jesus Alvarado. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zucker, Evan) (Entered: 05/06/2011)

#228

(#228) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) 227 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado and Sandra M. Roth's claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, in exchange for a waiver of Defendant's costs and fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rla) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

216 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#228) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) 227 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado and Sandra M. Roth's claims against Defendant U.S. Bank National Association are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, in exchange for a waiver of Defendant's costs and fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rla) (Entered: 05/11/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Jesus Alvarado. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zucker, Evan) (Entered: 05/06/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney J. Mark Moore on behalf of Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth. Filed by Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth (Moore, J) (Entered: 12/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#225) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Jonathan Shub on behalf of Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth. Filed by Plaintiffs Jesus Alvarado, Sandra M Roth (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: This Pretrial Scheduling Order governs the course of all pretrial proceedings in this case. For further guidance, consult the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. (See Order for details). (wr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#223) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The matter is called. Counsel state their appearances. The Court conducts the Scheduling Conference. The Court sets the following case management dates: (See document for details). Set deadlines and hearings: Discovery cut-off 8/15/2011; Motions due by 10/11/2011 at 8:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2011 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter; Jury Trial set for 1/17/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (wr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#222) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle re Stipulation for Protective Order 219 (ec) (Entered: 10/07/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#221) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Jesus Alvarado.. (Haffner, Joshua) (Entered: 10/04/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#220) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read SACV 07-00615 DOC (MANx). (rn) (Entered: 09/23/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • (#219) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Downey Savings & Loan Association F A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Norma) (Entered: 09/22/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss second, third and fourth cause of action without leave to amend filed by defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation.Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (ad) (Entered: 07/19/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes, upon Downey Savings & Loan Association F A served on 6/18/2007, answer due 7/8/2007. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by federal statute, upon John A MacDonald, agent - by leaving with Stephanie Dodge, Admin assistsnt. Due Diligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (klg) (Entered: 07/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes, upon Downey Financial Corporation served on 6/18/2007, answer due 7/8/2007. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by federal statute, upon John A MacDonald, Agent - by leaving with Stephanie Dodge, Admin Assistant. Due Diligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (klg) (Entered: 07/12/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OPPOSITION to Notice of Related Cases filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OPPOSITION to Notice of Related Case(s) 3 filed by Defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation. (esa) (Entered: 07/11/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of filing original summons with Court Clerk filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes. (esa) (Entered: 07/10/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Sandra Gamelin; Related Case(s): SACV 07-612 AHS (FMOx) (esa) (Entered: 07/05/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes. (dmjr) (Entered: 06/04/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Downey Savings & Loan Association F A, Downey Financial Corporation, Does 1 through 100 inclusive.(Filing fee $ 350), filed by plaintiffs Alfredo Reyes, Angelica Reyes.(dmjr) (Entered: 06/04/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Downey Savings and Loan Association, FA is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant