This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 19:52:06 (UTC).

Jesse Sloan v. Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP,et al,

Case Summary

On 10/06/2015 Jesse Sloan filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner and Judge George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-07818

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner

Judge

Judge George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Sloan

Defendants

James F. Dietz

John H. Diesch

CVR PARTNERS, LP

RENTECH NITROGEN GP, LLC

Michael S. Burke

Michael F. Ray

Keith B. Forman

RENTECH NITROGEN PARTNERS, LP

LUX MERGER SUB 2, LLC

LUX MERGER SUB 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan Jason Smith

Attorney at Brodsky and Smith LLC

9595 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin Nicole Murphy

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

650 Town Center Drive 20Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Patrick E Gibbs

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Brian T Glennon

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2049 Century Park East 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

Lary Alan Rappaport

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

Michael Allen Firestein

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

2049 Century Park East 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3206

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16567512 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jesse Sloan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 3 Exhibit rule 7.1 disclosure, # 4 Exhibit summons and addendum) (Attorney Evan Jason Smith added to party Jesse Sloan(pty:pla))(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Interested Parties and Summons Request are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event. No further action regarding these errors is required in this instance. Please see separate notice regarding the summons. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons - optional html form, 5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff Jesse Sloan. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#7

(#7) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jesse Sloan. upon CVR Partners, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Herbert Beigel. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jesse Sloan. upon Michael S. Burke waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; John H. Diesch waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; James F. Dietz waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Keith B. Forman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Michael F. Ray waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick E. Gibbs. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation 18 submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. The Stipulation is granted in full; 2. All proceedings and deadlines in this action should be stayed (including the February 5, 2016 deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint) other than the settlement proceedings. The Court hereby sets a hearing for preliminary settlement approval, or alternatively, a status conference, on April 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (mg) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Allen Firestein on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Firestein, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lary Alan Rappaport on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Rappaport, Lary) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Ferry, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#19

(#19) DECLARATION of Kristin N. Murphy re Stipulation to Stay Case,,, 18 filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Kristin) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending The Finalization of Settlement filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending the Finalization of Settlement)(Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Michael S. Burke(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party John H. Diesch(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party James F. Dietz(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Keith B. Forman(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Michael F. Ray(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP(pty:dft))(Murphy, Kristin) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu. The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. The Stipulation is granted in full; 2. Defendants Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP, Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1, LLC, and Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 5, 2016. (kss) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian T. Glennon in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Glennon, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#15

(#15) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court accepts and ENTERS the proposed order subject to the following: 1. A party seeking to file material under seal with the Court due to the provisions of this protective order must submit an appropriate application pursuant to Local Rule of Court 79-5.1. 2. Any challenge to a confidentiality designation must comply in full with the joint filing format described in Local Rule 37 for all discovery motions. re Stipulation for Order, 11 (sbou) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation 18 submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. The Stipulation is granted in full; 2. All proceedings and deadlines in this action should be stayed (including the February 5, 2016 deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint) other than the settlement proceedings. The Court hereby sets a hearing for preliminary settlement approval, or alternatively, a status conference, on April 28, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. (mg) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Allen Firestein on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Allen Firestein added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Firestein, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lary Alan Rappaport on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Rappaport, Lary) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry on behalf of Defendants CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC (Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party CVR Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacquelyn Nicole Ferry added to party Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC(pty:dft))(Ferry, Jacquelyn) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DECLARATION of Kristin N. Murphy re Stipulation to Stay Case,,, 18 filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murphy, Kristin) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending The Finalization of Settlement filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending the Finalization of Settlement)(Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Michael S. Burke(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party John H. Diesch(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party James F. Dietz(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Keith B. Forman(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Michael F. Ray(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Nicole Murphy added to party Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP(pty:dft))(Murphy, Kristin) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu. The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation submitted concurrently herewith, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. The Stipulation is granted in full; 2. Defendants Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP, Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, CVR Partners, LP, Lux Merger Sub 1, LLC, and Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 5, 2016. (kss) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian T. Glennon in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Glennon, Brian) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court accepts and ENTERS the proposed order subject to the following: 1. A party seeking to file material under seal with the Court due to the provisions of this protective order must submit an appropriate application pursuant to Local Rule of Court 79-5.1. 2. Any challenge to a confidentiality designation must comply in full with the joint filing format described in Local Rule 37 for all discovery motions. re Stipulation for Order, 11 (sbou) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patrick E Gibbs on behalf of Defendants Michael S. Burke, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP (Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party Michael S. Burke(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party John H. Diesch(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party James F. Dietz(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party Keith B. Forman(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party Michael F. Ray(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick E Gibbs added to party Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP(pty:dft))(Gibbs, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Michael S. Burke, CVR Partners, LP, John H. Diesch, James F. Dietz, Keith B. Forman, Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC, Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC, Michael F. Ray, Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC, Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP. (pj) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jesse Sloan. upon Michael S. Burke waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; John H. Diesch waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; James F. Dietz waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Keith B. Forman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Michael F. Ray waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Rentech Nitrogen GP, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Rentech Nitrogen Partners, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Patrick E. Gibbs. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jesse Sloan. upon CVR Partners, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Lux Merger Sub 1 LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015; Lux Merger Sub 2, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2015, answer due 12/7/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Herbert Beigel. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons - optional html form, 5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff Jesse Sloan. (Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Interested Parties and Summons Request are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event. No further action regarding these errors is required in this instance. Please see separate notice regarding the summons. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16567512 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jesse Sloan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 3 Exhibit rule 7.1 disclosure, # 4 Exhibit summons and addendum) (Attorney Evan Jason Smith added to party Jesse Sloan(pty:pla))(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less