This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 21:41:02 (UTC).

Jammers Inc, Houston NFL Holdings LP Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2015 Jammers Inc, Houston NFL Holdings LP was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-ML-02668

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicholas Racklin

8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Jammers Inc

Michael Holinko

Ambrose BD 2, LLC

Village Pub, LLC

Sir Waldon, Inc.

Martinis of New Orleans, Inc.

Dude N Brah Inc

Two Pauls, Inc.

New Lounge 4324, LLC

Tripple J Entertainment, Inc

P.J. Hafiz Club Management, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

Houston NFL Holdings LP

Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC

National Football Legue, Inc

The Rams Football Company LLC

Miami Dolphins Ltd

CBS Corporation

Detroit Lions Inc

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason R Lee

Attorney at Zimmerman Reed LLP

80 South 8Th Street 1100 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider LPA

One West Fourth Street 18Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christian A Jenkins

Attorney at Minnillo and Jenkins Co LPA

2712 Observatory Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr

Attorney at Reinhardt Wendorf and Blanchfield

332 Minnesota Street

St Paul, MN 55101

Jodie Williams

Attorney at The Mogin Law Firm PC

707 Broadway Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

Edward Diver

Attorney at Langer Grogan and Diver

1717 Arch Street Suite 4130

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

Scott M Grzenczyk

Attorney at Girard Gibbs LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 1125

Oakland, CA 94612

Brittany DeJong

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Gregory E Woodard

Attorney at Larsen Woodard LLP

100 Bayview Circle Suite 4500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Betsy C Manifold

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Jayne Arnold Goldstein

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1972 Bell Tower Lane, Suite 203

Weston, FL 33326

Robert S Kitchenoff

Attorney at Weinstein Kitchenoff and Asher LLC

100 South Broad Street Suite 705

Philadelphia, PA 19110-1061

Ryan F Stephan

Attorney at Stephan Zouras LLP

205 North Michigan Avenue Suite 2560

Chicago, IL 60601

Daniel R Karon

Attorney at Karon LLC

700 West St Clair Avenue Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Marc I Gross

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Robert J Larocca

Attorney at Kohn Swift and Graf PC

One South Broad Street Suite 2100

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Adam M Tamburelli

Attorney at Sullivan Krieger Truong Spagnola and Klausner LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 1700

Long Beach, CA 90802

Thomas H Burt

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz LLP

270 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Lesley E Weaver

Karen Hanson Riebel

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Avenue South Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2159

87 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:15-ML-02668 BRO(JEMx), In Re: National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigatiion. Case assigned to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: 2:15-cv-04606-BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-05261 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-05813 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-06145 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-06402 BRO(JEMx); 1:15-06771. (esa) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for attorney James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987428 paid.) filed by Plaintiff, D.J.'s Sports Bar, Inc. National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Attorney James B Zouras added to party National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation(pty:inre)) (Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for attorney James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987428 paid.) 2 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for attorney Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987714 paid.) filed by Plaintiff, D.J.'s Sports Bar, Inc. National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ryan F Stephan added to party National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation(pty:inre)) (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 2 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James B. Zouras on behalf of Plaintiff D.J. Sports Bar, Inc., designating Waived for MDL 2668 as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#6

(#6) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 4 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan F. Stephan on behalf of Plaintiff D.J. Sports Bar, Inc., designating Waived for MDL 2668 as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#7

(#7) REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference filed by 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc M Seltzer counsel for Plaintiffs 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba, Nicholas Racklin. Adding Marc M. Seltzer as counsel of record for 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin. (Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Christina Malerba(pty:pla), Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Nicholas Racklin(pty:pla))(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Christina Malerba, National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation, Nicholas Racklin, re REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference 7 served on January 7, 2016, Request for Status Conference. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

#115

(#115) ORDER On Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 110 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until 45 days after Plaintiff has either filed or designated the operative complaint(s) in MDL No. 2668. (jp) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

#114

(#114) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE: MDL PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 85 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate to coincide with the Case Management Conference on Wednesday, May 18, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. (See Dkt. No. 97 (continuing Case Management Conference).) IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

#113

(#113) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Sonoma County Superior Court 24 filed by Consol Plaintiff Robert Gary Lippincott, Jr. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

#112

(#112) Mail Returned addressed to Alexander M. Schack re Order 97 . (jloz) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

#111

(#111) Notice of Electronic Filing re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 109 , Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 110 , e-mailed to Attorney Tracy D Rezvani at trezvani@vanivolin.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/22/2016)

#110

(#110) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Re: 16cv01025-BRO-Sir Waldon, Inc. dba Oggi's Pizza: Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs complaint is extended until 45 days after Plaintiff has either filed or designated the operative complaint(s) in MDL No. 2668 filed by Defendants Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#109

(#109) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC, identifying DIRECTV, LLC; DIRECTV Holdings LLC; The DIRECTV Group, Inc.; Greenlady Corp.; DTV Entertainment, Inc.; DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC; AT&T Inc.. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

#108

(#108) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James W Anderson on behalf of Consol Plaintiffs JS Entertainment, Inc, MJ Ventures, Inc, Tripple J Entertainment, Inc, Plaintiffs Our Ventures Inc, SD Billy Frogs, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Order)(Attorney James W Anderson added to party JS Entertainment, Inc(pty:conpla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party MJ Ventures, Inc(pty:conpla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party Our Ventures Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party SD Billy Frogs, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party Tripple J Entertainment, Inc(pty:conpla))(Anderson, James) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#107

(#107) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Sonoma County Superior Court 24 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Sports Networks, LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC. (Bladow, Robyn) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) ORDER On Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 110 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until 45 days after Plaintiff has either filed or designated the operative complaint(s) in MDL No. 2668. (jp) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING RE: MDL PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 85 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate to coincide with the Case Management Conference on Wednesday, May 18, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. (See Dkt. No. 97 (continuing Case Management Conference).) IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz) (Entered: 03/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Sonoma County Superior Court 24 filed by Consol Plaintiff Robert Gary Lippincott, Jr. (Marker, Caleb) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) Mail Returned addressed to Alexander M. Schack re Order 97 . (jloz) (Entered: 03/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) Notice of Electronic Filing re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 109 , Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 110 , e-mailed to Attorney Tracy D Rezvani at trezvani@vanivolin.com bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Re: 16cv01025-BRO-Sir Waldon, Inc. dba Oggi's Pizza: Defendants time to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs complaint is extended until 45 days after Plaintiff has either filed or designated the operative complaint(s) in MDL No. 2668 filed by Defendants Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC, identifying DIRECTV, LLC; DIRECTV Holdings LLC; The DIRECTV Group, Inc.; Greenlady Corp.; DTV Entertainment, Inc.; DIRECTV Group Holdings, LLC; AT&T Inc.. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Entered: 03/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James W Anderson on behalf of Consol Plaintiffs JS Entertainment, Inc, MJ Ventures, Inc, Tripple J Entertainment, Inc, Plaintiffs Our Ventures Inc, SD Billy Frogs, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Order)(Attorney James W Anderson added to party JS Entertainment, Inc(pty:conpla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party MJ Ventures, Inc(pty:conpla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party Our Ventures Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party SD Billy Frogs, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney James W Anderson added to party Tripple J Entertainment, Inc(pty:conpla))(Anderson, James) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Sonoma County Superior Court 24 filed by Defendants DIRECTV Sports Networks, LLC, Directv Holdings LLC, Directv, LLC. (Bladow, Robyn) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tracy D Rezvani on behalf of Consol Plaintiffs Duck Duck LLC, Dude N Brah Inc (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Text Only Order)(Attorney Tracy D Rezvani added to party Duck Duck LLC(pty:conpla), Attorney Tracy D Rezvani added to party Dude N Brah Inc(pty:conpla))(Rezvani, Tracy) (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Errata to Amended Certificate of Service filed by plaintiffs 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba, Nicholas Racklin. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Christina Malerba, National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation, Nicholas Racklin, re REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference 7 served on January 7, 2016, Request for Status Conference. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc M Seltzer counsel for Plaintiffs 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba, Nicholas Racklin. Adding Marc M. Seltzer as counsel of record for 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin. (Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Christina Malerba(pty:pla), Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Nicholas Racklin(pty:pla))(Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST for Hearing Status Conference filed by 8812 Tavern Corp., d/b/a Bench Sports Bar, Christina Malerba and Nicholas Racklin National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Seltzer, Marc) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 4 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan F. Stephan on behalf of Plaintiff D.J. Sports Bar, Inc., designating Waived for MDL 2668 as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: granting 2 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James B. Zouras on behalf of Plaintiff D.J. Sports Bar, Inc., designating Waived for MDL 2668 as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION for attorney Ryan F. Stephan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987714 paid.) filed by Plaintiff, D.J.'s Sports Bar, Inc. National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ryan F Stephan added to party National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation(pty:inre)) (Stephan, Ryan) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION for attorney James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987428 paid.) 2 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for attorney James B. Zouras to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16987428 paid.) filed by Plaintiff, D.J.'s Sports Bar, Inc. National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation. (Attorney James B Zouras added to party National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigation(pty:inre)) (Zouras, James) (Entered: 12/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation received creating Master Docket MDL 2:15-ML-02668 BRO(JEMx), In Re: National Football Leagues Sunday Ticket Antitrust Litigatiion. Case assigned to Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Consolidating Cases: 2:15-cv-04606-BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-05261 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-05813 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-06145 BRO(JEMx); 2:15-cv-06402 BRO(JEMx); 1:15-06771. (esa) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.