This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 14:28:10 (UTC).

JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Case Summary

On 09/10/2015 JAMES MADISON PROJECT filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF STATE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01478

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES MADISON PROJECT

SHANE HARRIS

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Prescott Moss

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK S. ZAID, P.C.

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20036

Mark S. Zaid

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK S. ZAID, P.C.

1250 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

Eric J. Soskin

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

20 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

1 #5

Summons State

1 #3

Summons USADC

1 #2

Exhibit LCvR 7.1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/12/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/16/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Notice of Related Case filed by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of New Information Regarding Defendant's Notice of Related Case by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Brown Scheduling Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order filed by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#16

(#16) Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order filed by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of New Information Regarding Defendant's Notice of Related Case by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Brown Scheduling Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 3 by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to Notice of Related Case filed by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Case related to Case No. 15-1459. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/16/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/16/15. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/12/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SHANE HARRIS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4238828) filed by The James Madison Project, Shane Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit LCvR 7.1, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG, # 5 Summons State)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less