This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:10:31 (UTC).

Jacobson et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2014 Jacobson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02485

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter Ragan

Leesa Jacobson

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

Manuel Padilla, Jr.

Jeffrey Self

S Spencer

Lloyd Easterling

Roger San-Martin

Rosalinda Huey

United States Office of Border Patrol

N Ballistrea

Michael J Fisher

R Gil Kerlikowske

United States Customs and Border Protection

Jeh Johnson

J Joyner

K Riden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan Forrest

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP - San Francisco, CA

1 Front St., Ste. 35

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mitra Ebadolahi

Attorney at ACLU - San Diego & Imperial Counties

P.O. Box 87131

San Diego, CA 92138-7131

James Duff Lyall

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

John David Loy

Attorney at ACLU - San Diego & Imperial Counties

P.O. Box 87131

San Diego, CA 92138-7131

Tracy Ebanks

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP - San Francisco, CA

1 Front St., Ste. 35

San Francisco, CA 94111

Winslow B Taub

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP - San Francisco, CA

1 Front St., Ste. 35

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joel Edman

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

Victoria Lopez

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

Christina E Dashe

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP - San Diego, CA

9191 Towne Centre Dr., Ste. 600

San Diego, CA 92122

Daniel Joseph Pochoda

Attorney at ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

P.O. Box 17148

Phoenix, AZ 85011

Defendant Attorney

Eric B Beckenhauer

Attorney at US Deptt of Justice

20 Massachusetts Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11084747 filed by Peter Ragan, Leesa Jacobson. (Lyall, James) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Lyall, James) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11084747. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-CV-02485-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Rosalinda Huey, # 2 Summons Roger San-Martin, # 3 Summons R. Gil Kerlikowske, # 4 Summons N. Ballistrea, # 5 Summons Michael J. Fisher, # 6 Summons Manuel Padilla, Jr., # 7 Summons Lloyd Easterling, # 8 Summons K. Riden, # 9 Summons Jeh Johnson, # 10 Summons Jeffrey Self, # 11 Summons J. Joyner)(Lyall, James) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(EGP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Lloyd Easterling, S Spencer. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) ***These two summons were not issued in prior batch submitted on 11/20/2014***(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/24/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Winslow B Taub on behalf of plaintiffs Leesa Jacobson and Peter Ragan. (BAS) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tracy Ebanks on behalf of plaintiffs Leesa Jacobson and Peter Ragan. (BAS) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#45

(#45) ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Government shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 26, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/30/2015.(ALS) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#44

(#44) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, K Riden, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self, S Spencer, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#43

(#43) REPLY Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Ragan In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief,, # 2 Exhibit (Part 1) to Declaration of Peter Ragan, # 3 Exhibit (Part 2) to Declaration of Peter Ragan)(ALS) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#42

(#42) ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs' Lodged: Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 40). FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiffs have not done so already, they shall submit a courtesy copy to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/11/2015.(ALS) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#41

(#41) ORDER that oral argument currently set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2015 before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, shall be held in Courtroom 3C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 W. Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/10/2015. (ALS) (Entered: 03/10/2015)

#40

(#40) FILED at (Doc. 43 )- LODGED Proposed Reply Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 39 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Ragan In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) to Declaration of Peter Ragan, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2) to Declaration of Peter Ragan)(Taub, Winslow) Modified on 3/11/2015 (ALS). (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#39

(#39) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taub, Winslow) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#38

(#38) RESPONSE in Opposition re: 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, K Riden, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self, S Spencer, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Ex. A - Traffic Control Plan, # 3 Ex. B - Traffic Checkpoint Policy, # 4 Ex. C (part 1 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 5 Ex. C (part 2 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 6 Ex. C (part 3 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 7 Ex. D - Spencer Declaration, # 8 Ex. E - Huey Declaration)(ALS) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

#37

(#37) ORDER that both of the Government's motions (Doc. 32 & 33 ) are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Government's Lodged: Proposed Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 34) and it is deemed timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument shall be heard in this matter at 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2015 before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, Courtroom 5C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 W. Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 2/27/2015. (ALS) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Government shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 26, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/30/2015.(ALS) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, K Riden, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self, S Spencer, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beckenhauer, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) REPLY Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Ragan In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief,, # 2 Exhibit (Part 1) to Declaration of Peter Ragan, # 3 Exhibit (Part 2) to Declaration of Peter Ragan)(ALS) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs' Lodged: Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 40). FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiffs have not done so already, they shall submit a courtesy copy to chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/11/2015.(ALS) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER that oral argument currently set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2015 before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, shall be held in Courtroom 3C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 W. Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/10/2015. (ALS) (Entered: 03/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) FILED at (Doc. 43 )- LODGED Proposed Reply Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 39 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Ragan In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) to Declaration of Peter Ragan, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 2) to Declaration of Peter Ragan)(Taub, Winslow) Modified on 3/11/2015 (ALS). (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taub, Winslow) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) RESPONSE in Opposition re: 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, K Riden, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self, S Spencer, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Ex. A - Traffic Control Plan, # 3 Ex. B - Traffic Checkpoint Policy, # 4 Ex. C (part 1 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 5 Ex. C (part 2 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 6 Ex. C (part 3 of 3) - San Martin Declaration, # 7 Ex. D - Spencer Declaration, # 8 Ex. E - Huey Declaration)(ALS) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER that both of the Government's motions (Doc. 32 & 33 ) are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Government's Lodged: Proposed Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 34) and it is deemed timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument shall be heard in this matter at 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, April 21, 2015 before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald, Courtroom 5C, Evo A. DeConcini U.S. Courthouse, 405 W. Congress Street, Tucson, Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 2/27/2015. (ALS) (Entered: 02/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Macdonald conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ethan Forrest on behalf of plaintiffs Leesa Jacobson and Peter Ragan. (BAS) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tracy Ebanks on behalf of plaintiffs Leesa Jacobson and Peter Ragan. (BAS) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Winslow B Taub on behalf of plaintiffs Leesa Jacobson and Peter Ragan. (BAS) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Lloyd Easterling, S Spencer. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) ***These two summons were not issued in prior batch submitted on 11/20/2014***(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to N Ballistrea, Lloyd Easterling, Michael J Fisher, Rosalinda Huey, Jeh Johnson, J Joyner, R Gil Kerlikowske, Manuel Padilla, Jr, Roger San-Martin, Jeffrey Self. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(EGP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Rosalinda Huey, # 2 Summons Roger San-Martin, # 3 Summons R. Gil Kerlikowske, # 4 Summons N. Ballistrea, # 5 Summons Michael J. Fisher, # 6 Summons Manuel Padilla, Jr., # 7 Summons Lloyd Easterling, # 8 Summons K. Riden, # 9 Summons Jeh Johnson, # 10 Summons Jeffrey Self, # 11 Summons J. Joyner)(Lyall, James) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Office of Border Patrol. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11084747. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-CV-02485-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Leesa Jacobson, Peter Ragan. (Lyall, James) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11084747 filed by Peter Ragan, Leesa Jacobson. (Lyall, James) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(DLC) (Entered: 11/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.