Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 00:22:15 (UTC).

Jacobs v. CDS, PA et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2014 Jacobs filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against CDS, PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr

Defendants

Pocatello Hospital, LLC

LHP Pocatello, LLC

CDS, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DeAnne Casperson

Attorney at HOLDEN KIDWELL HAHN & CRAPO

Po Box 50130

Idaho Falls, ID 83405

Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich

Attorney at Holden Kidwell Hahn & Crapo, PLLC

Po Box 50130

Idaho Falls, ID 83405

Defendant Attorneys

Scott A Memmott

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Howard D Burnett

Attorney at HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS & HAWLEY

Po Box 100

Pocatello, ID 83204

Holly C Barker

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Scott J. Smith

Attorney at RACINE OLSON NYE BUDGE & BAILEY

Richard A Hearn

Attorney at HEARN & WOOD LLP

1906 Jennie Lee Drive

Idaho Falls, ID 83404

Eric Lynn Olsen

Attorney at Echo Hawk & Olsen, PLLC

Po Box 6119

Pocatello, ID 83205

Daniel Carl Green

Attorney at RACINE OLSON NYE BUDGE & BAILEY

Po Box 1391

Pocatello, ID 83204-1391

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CDS, PA, LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Cover Letter)(cjm)(Paid $400 filing fee by check on Receipt No. 12840.) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#2

(#2) MOTION to File In Camera and Under Seal Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730 DeAnne Casperson appearing for Plaintiff Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. Responses due by 8/18/2014. (cjm) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#3

(#3) SEALED ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm) Modified on 2/12/2015 to reflect UNSEALED per Order Dkt. 7 (cjs). (Entered: 08/04/2014)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Extension of Time, Amy S Howe appearing for Interested Party United States of America. Responses due by 10/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(cjm)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER The United States' Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time (Dkt. 4 ) is GRANTED. The United States shall have until 1/5/15 to determine whether to intervene. If the United States decides to intervene, any complaint in intervention shall be filed on or before 1/5/15. The complaint shall remain sealed until further order of this Court. This Order shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of the United States That It Is Not Intervening At This Time by United States of America. (cjs)

#7

(#7) ORDER. This entire case shall be unsealed as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is thus directed to unseal all documents on file in this case. The relators, using due diligence, shall serve their complaint and all other documents on file in this action upon defendants within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to CDS, PA, LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(cjs)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. CDS, PA served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. (Casperson, DeAnne)

#33

(#33) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 20 Defendant CDS, P.A. d/b/a Pocatello Women's Health Clinic's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendants Pocatello Hospital LLC, d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC and LHP Pocatello, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

#34

(#34) AMENDED COMPLAINT And Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr.(Casperson, DeAnne) Modified on 10/8/2015 to remove all capitalization from docket text (cjs).

#35

(#35) NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2015 at 4:00 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlb)

#36

(#36) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Casperson, DeAnne)

#37

(#37) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2016. Contact ADR Coordinator by 2/16/2016. Discovery due by 1/20/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

#38

(#38) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Casperson, DeAnne) Modified on 11/20/2015 to remove all capitalization from docket text (cjs).

#39

(#39) ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint, by CDS, PA.(Smith, Scott)

#40

(#40) NOTICE by CDS, PA of Change of Firm and Contact Information (Hearn, Richard)

#41

(#41) Defendants PMC and LHP's ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint, by LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC.(Barker, Holly)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Defendants PMC and LHP's ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint, by LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC.(Barker, Holly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE by CDS, PA of Change of Firm and Contact Information (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint, by CDS, PA.(Smith, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Casperson, DeAnne) Modified on 11/20/2015 to remove all capitalization from docket text (cjs).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2016. Contact ADR Coordinator by 2/16/2016. Discovery due by 1/20/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2017. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Casperson, DeAnne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2015 at 4:00 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) AMENDED COMPLAINT And Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr.(Casperson, DeAnne) Modified on 10/8/2015 to remove all capitalization from docket text (cjs).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 20 Defendant CDS, P.A. d/b/a Pocatello Women's Health Clinic's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendants Pocatello Hospital LLC, d/b/a Portneuf Medical Center, LLC and LHP Pocatello, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 28 Defendant's Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. LHP Pocatello, LLC served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. (Casperson, DeAnne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. CDS, PA served on 3/11/2015, answer due 4/1/2015. (Casperson, DeAnne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to CDS, PA, LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER. This entire case shall be unsealed as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is thus directed to unseal all documents on file in this case. The relators, using due diligence, shall serve their complaint and all other documents on file in this action upon defendants within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of the United States That It Is Not Intervening At This Time by United States of America. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER The United States' Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time (Dkt. 4 ) is GRANTED. The United States shall have until 1/5/15 to determine whether to intervene. If the United States decides to intervene, any complaint in intervention shall be filed on or before 1/5/15. The complaint shall remain sealed until further order of this Court. This Order shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION for Extension of Time, Amy S Howe appearing for Interested Party United States of America. Responses due by 10/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(cjm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SEALED ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm) Modified on 2/12/2015 to reflect UNSEALED per Order Dkt. 7 (cjs). (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to File In Camera and Under Seal Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3730 DeAnne Casperson appearing for Plaintiff Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. Responses due by 8/18/2014. (cjm) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CDS, PA, LHP Pocatello, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, filed by Jeffrey Jacobs, Dr. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Cover Letter)(cjm)(Paid $400 filing fee by check on Receipt No. 12840.) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pocatello Hospital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Elizabeth Ulrich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DeAnne Casperson