This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2016 at 10:23:51 (UTC).

IPDEV Co. v. Ameranth, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2014 IPDEV Co filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ameranth, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-01303

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

IPDEV Co.

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ameranth, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew C Warnecke

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60601-3315

Duane H Mathiowetz

Attorney at LeClairRyan LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

George Chin-Lun Yu

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear St. Tower, #3200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Helen Simkins Irza

Attorney at Helen Irza Law

13638 Derby Downs Court

San Diego, CA 92130

Robert G Lancaster

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

120 Broadway, Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Stephen Maxwell Hankins

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

One Market Plaza, Suite 3200, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1116

Alison L. Maddeford

Attorney at Schiff Hardin, LLP

One Market, Spear Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Oliver R Ashe, Jr

Attorney at Ashe P.C.

11440 Isaac Newton Square North, Suite 210

Reston, VA 20190

Patricia L Peden

Attorney at LeClairRyan LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Patrick Lai

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

One Market Plaza, Thirty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Ethan Mahoney Watts

Attorney at Watts Law Offices

12340 El Camino Real, Suite 430

San Diego, CA 92130

John William Osborne

Attorney at Osborne Law LLC

33 Habitat Lane

Cortlandt Manor, NY 10567

Michael D Fabiano

Attorney at Fabiano Law Firm, P.C.

12526 High Bluff Drive, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

William J. Caldarelli

Attorney at Caldarelli, Hejmanowski, Page & Leer, LLP

12340 El Camino Real, Suite 430

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#35

#36

#37

#38

#39

#40

#41

#42

#43

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: The following hearings are vacated: Jury Trial of 1/4/2015 and Pretrial Conference of 12/4/2015. (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Warnecke. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/19/2015.(vam) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8138074.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Warnecke, Andrew)(vam). (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Stephen M. Hankins (Hankins, Stephen)(aef). (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Alison L. Maddeford (Maddeford, Alison) (aef). (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Alison L. Maddeford (Lai, Patrick) Modified on 3/25/2015- QC mailer sent re wrong s/ (aef). (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Patrick Lai (Lai, Patrick) (aef). (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Stephen M. Hankins (Lai, Patrick) Modified on 3/25/2015-QC mailer sent re wrong s/ (aef). (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/17/2015 is vacated. Case is stayed. (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IPDEV Co. re 31 Notice of Change of Address (Mathiowetz, Duane) (dls). (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Simkins Irza on behalf of IPDEV Co. (Irza, Helen) (aef). (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Oliver R Ashe, Jr appearing for Plaintiff IPDEV Co. (jao) (Entered: 06/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:11-cv-01810-DMS-WVG. The new case number is 14-cv-1303-DMS-WVG. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/28/2014. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/28/2014.(srm) (Entered: 05/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Duane H Mathiowetz on behalf of IPDEV Co. (Mathiowetz, Duane)Attorney Duane H Mathiowetz added to party IPDEV Co.(pty:pla) (srm). (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Party with Financial Interest (Yu, George) (srm). (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by George Chin-Lun Yu on behalf of IPDEV Co. (Yu, George) (srm). (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,738,449*, *5,991,739*, *6,384,850*, *6,871,325*, *8,146,077* cc: USPTO.. (dls) (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1). (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ameranth, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-7063654), filed by IPDEV Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:14-cv-1303-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Yu, George)(dls) (ATTNY MAINT) Modified on 5/27/2014, proposed low number order prepared (srm)(av1). (Entered: 05/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameranth Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert G Lancaster(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duane H. Mathiowetz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Hankins