This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Interface IP Holdings LLC v. Preferred Hotel Group Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2014 Interface IP Holdings LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Preferred Hotel Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00128

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Interface IP Holdings LLC

Defendant

Preferred Hotel Group Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew G. Hamill

Bradford J. Black

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,406,663. (ntl) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Interface IP Holdings LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - Unopposed - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Unopposed] - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradford J. Black and Andrew G. Hamill - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Interface IP Holdings LLC- filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. Preferred Hotel Group Inc. served on 2/3/2014, answer due 2/24/2014. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,406,663 B2;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Preferred Hotel Group Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1452654.) - filed by Interface IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interface IP Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Grant Hamill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford John Black