This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 03:08:57 (UTC).

INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC et al v. ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2014 INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC

INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC

Defendants

ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

FLAGSHIP CITY INSURANCE COMPANY

ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY

ERIE FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Consolidated Defendants

HM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

HM CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

HIGHMARK, INC.

HIGHMARK CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC TITLE INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

HM INSURANCE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry M. Sneath

Attorney at Picadio, Sneath, Miller & Norton

Four Gateway Center, 444 Liberty Ave., Suite 1105

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert Cutler

5215 N O'Connor Blvd Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75039

Andrew J. Wright

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP

5215 N. O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75115

Christian J. Hurt

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP

5215 N. O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75115

Derek T. Gilliland

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP

205 Linda Dr.

Daingerfield, TX 75638

Edward K. Chin

Attorney at ALBRITTON LAW FIRM

1330 N. White Chapel Blvd, Suite 100

Southlake, TX 76092

Kelly A. Williams

Attorney at Picadio, Sneath, Miller & Norton

Four Gateway Center, 444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1105

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kirk A. Voss

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach LLP

Suite 1900, 5215 N O'Connor Blvd

Irving, TX 75039

Robert L. Wagner

Attorney at Picadio Sneath Miller & Norton, P.C.

Four Gateway Center, 444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 1105

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Ross Leonoudakis

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP

5215 N. O'Connor Blvd, Suite 1900

Irving, TX 75115

Consolidated Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Alexander W. Saksen

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

707 Grant Street, 38Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David C. Marcus

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand, Ave., Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory H. Lantier

Attorney at WilmerHale LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington Dc, DC 20006

Leslie Stierman Pearlson

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02019

Monica Grewal

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Alexander Baxter

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Arthur H. Stroyd, Jr.

Attorney at Del Sole Cavanaugh Stroyd LLC

Three Ppg Place, Suite 600

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Russell Cass

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Vernon Winters

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Erik John Carlson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#130

#131

#134

#135

#136

#137

223 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) ORDER GRANTING 136 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Attorney Edward K. Chin is terminated. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/14/16. (jad) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Edward Chin, and Request Termination of His Electronic Notices by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Chin, Edward) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) REPLY BRIEF re 132 Motion to Dismiss, filed by ERIE FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, FLAGSHIP CITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lantier, Gregory ) (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to 132 Motion to Dismiss, filed by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Hurt, Christian) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) BRIEF in Support re 132 Motion to Dismiss, filed by ERIE FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, FLAGSHIP CITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Lantier, Gregory ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint, by ERIE FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, FLAGSHIP CITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lantier, Gregory ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ORDER Regarding Scheduling. In light of the Court's entry of an Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) 130 , the Court's scheduling Order of October 14, 2015 123 remains in effect, subject to being modified by further Order upon the Motion of a party for cause shown. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/09/2015. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Hornak, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) ORDER GRANTING 129 Motion for Entry of Judgment. It is ORDERED that the Court expressly finds no just reason for delay and, under 117 Opinion dated 9/25/15 and 118 Order dated 9/25/15 respectively, GRANTS FINAL JUDGMENT under FRCP 54(b) on Plaintiffs' claims based on U.S. Patent Nos. 6,519,581 ("the '581 patent"); 6,546,002 ("the '002 patent"); 6,510,434 ("the '434 patent"), and that all claims based on U.S. Patent No. 7,757,298 are unaffected by this Order and Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/4/15. (bdb) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) MOTION for Entry of Judgment by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wagner, Robert) (Entered: 11/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/30/15. (Court Reporter: Julie Kienzle) (jad) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Wagner, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Wagner, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/26/14. (bdb) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Williams on behalf of INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Williams, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/25/14. (lck) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Wagner on behalf of INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC. (Wagner, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet, # 2 Complaint, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D) (dm) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ERIE FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ERIE INSURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, FLAGSHIP CITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-3300198), filed by INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC, INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) (dm) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIGHMARK INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTELLECTUAL VENTURES I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY is a litigant