This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 10:54:30 (UTC).

Integrated Claim Systems, LLC v. Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Integrated Claim Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Integrated Claims Systems LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Travelers Lloyds of TX Ins Co

Travelers Indemnity Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Patrick R. Colsher

Attorney at Ward & Zinna, LLC - NJ

382 Springfield Ave., Suite 300

Summit, NJ 07901

Robert Christopher Bunt

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

Charles Ainsworth

Attorney at Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.

100 East Ferguson, Suite 1114

Tyler, TX 75702

John F. Ward

Attorney at Kelley, Drye & Warren - NY

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Stephen P. McNamara

Attorney at St. Onge, Steward, Johnston & Reens

986 Bedford St.

Stamford, CT 06905-5619

David G. Lindenbaum

Attorney at Kelley, Drye & Warren - NY

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joshua L. Goldberg

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP-DC

901 New York Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

Patrick J. Coyne

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP-DC

901 New York Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4413

Eric J. TeVelde

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-HTFD

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Robert L. Burns, II

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garret & Dunner, LLP-VA

Two Freedom Square, 11955 Freedom Drive

Reston, VA 20190

Elizabeth Ann Alquist

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP-Trmbl St Htfd-CT

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N. College Ave., Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4275450.), filed by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '020 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '768 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Integrated Claim Systems, LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/22/2013)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company on 8/27/2013, by personal service; answer due: 9/17/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John F Ward on behalf of Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4302186. (Ward, John) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Integrated Claim Systems, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

#90

(#90) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McNamara, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#89

(#89) ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference conducted on 2/27/2015, the parties were to meet, confer and submit a 26(f) Report. To date no such report has been submitted. The parties will submit a joint Rule 26(f) report no later than 12/16/2015. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/2/2015.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

#88

(#88) ANSWER to 85 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Integrated Claims Systems LLC.(Ward, John) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#87

(#87) ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick R. Colsher terminated. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/8/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#86

(#86) MOTION for Patrick R. Colsher to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff by Integrated Claims Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, John) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

#85

(#85) ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. , COUNTERCLAIM against Integrated Claims Systems LLC by Travelers Indemnity Co.(TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#84

(#84) ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/17/2015 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Further extensions of this deadline are unlikely to be granted. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/24/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

#83

(#83) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 17, 2015 to Respond to Amended Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Co. (TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#82

(#82) ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/27/2015 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/13/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McNamara, Stephen) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone conference conducted on 2/27/2015, the parties were to meet, confer and submit a 26(f) Report. To date no such report has been submitted. The parties will submit a joint Rule 26(f) report no later than 12/16/2015. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/2/2015.(Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) ANSWER to 85 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Integrated Claims Systems LLC.(Ward, John) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) ORDER granting 86 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick R. Colsher terminated. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/8/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) MOTION for Patrick R. Colsher to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff by Integrated Claims Systems LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, John) (Entered: 05/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. , COUNTERCLAIM against Integrated Claims Systems LLC by Travelers Indemnity Co.(TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/17/2015 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Further extensions of this deadline are unlikely to be granted. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/24/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 17, 2015 to Respond to Amended Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Co. (TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/27/2015 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/13/2015. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) MOTION for Extension of Time until up to and including March 27, 2015 to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 79 Amended Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Co. (TeVelde, Eric) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David G Lindenbaum on behalf of Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4303984. (Lindenbaum, David) (Entered: 09/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Integrated Claim Systems, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John F Ward on behalf of Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4302186. (Ward, John) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed as to Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company on 8/27/2013, by personal service; answer due: 9/17/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Integrated Claim Systems, LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Travelers Lloyds of Texas Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4275450.), filed by Integrated Claim Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '020 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '768 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.