This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2018 at 01:30:52 (UTC).

Inland & Offshore Contractors, Ltd. v. Hasselman et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2015 Inland Offshore Contractors, Ltd filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Hasselman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen G. Berrigan and Michael North. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-05675

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Helen G. Berrigan

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inland & Offshore Contractors, Ltd.

Defendants

David Hasselman

International Marine Sales and Export, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry A. King(Designation Retained)

John A. Cangelosi(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER AND REASONS re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment; ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for default judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff's breach of contract claim under Florida law, and jud gment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendants in the amount of $100,000.00 plus prejudgment interest calculated using the statutory rate of interest found in Fla. Stat. 55.03, with the accrual of prejudgment interest beginning on September 25, 2015. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/4/2016.(blg)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER AND REASONS re 10 MOTION for Default Judgment; ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for default judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff's breach of contract claim under Florida law, and jud gment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendants in the amount of $100,000.00 plus prejudgment interest calculated using the statutory rate of interest found in Fla. Stat. 55.03, with the accrual of prejudgment interest beginning on September 25, 2015. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/4/2016.(blg)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Cangelosi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry Arthur King