This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 11:09:25 (UTC).

Ingeniador, LLC, Ingeniador, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 Ingeniador, LLC, Ingeniador, LLC was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judges overseeing this case are US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll and Judge Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll

Judge

Judge Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiff and Plaintiff

Ingeniador, LLC

Defendants

Monoprice, Inc.

Blucora, Inc.

Consolidated Defendant

Zazzle, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jean Gabriel Vidal-Font

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

221 Plaza Building, 5Th Floor

San Juan, PR 00917

Maristella Collazo-Soto

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

221 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Suite 403

Hato Rey, PR 00917

Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola

Attorney at Ferraiuoli-Torres, Marchand & Rovira PSC

221 Ponce De Leon Ave., Plaza Condominium, Suite 403

San Juan, PR 00917

Consolidated Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Andrew F. Pratt

Attorney at Venable, LLP

575 7Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Damon W.D. Wright

Attorney at Venable, LLP

575 7Th Steet, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera

Attorney at McConnell Valdes, LLC

P.O. Box 364225

San Juan, PR 00936-4225

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#48

#49

#50

#51

#52

#53

#54

#55

#56

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) JUDGMENT dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/18/16.(np) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER re 54 Stipulation of Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/18/2016. (brc) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Ingeniador, LLC and Defendant(s) Monoprice, Inc., Blucora, Inc. and Zazzle, Inc. by Ingeniador, LLC. (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) Modified on 2/19/2016 adding filer (np). (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER re: 42 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiff Ingeniador, LLC's is DENIED. The Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike 49 and the MOTION to Strike Defendants' Opposition 51 are thus, MOOT. The parties are forewarned that this contentious motion practice is frowned upon by the Court and runs afoul of the Model Rules of Prof'l Conduct r. 3.2. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 12/17/2015.(VCC) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) RESPONSE in Opposition to 51 MOTION to Strike Defendants Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc. and Zazzle, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Ingeniador, LLC's filed by Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc., Zazzle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Declaration)(Quinones-Rivera, Roberto) Modified on 8/27/2015 to edit dkt. text(ab). (Entered: 08/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) MOTION to Strike Defendants Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc. and Zazzle, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Ingeniador, LLC's Re: 49 MOTION for Leave to File Document / Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike SurReply filed by Ingeniador, LLC filed by Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola on behalf of Ingeniador, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2015 (Related document(s) 49 ) (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 08/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc., Zazzle, Inc. Re: 49 MOTION for Leave to File Document / Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike SurReply filed by Ingeniador, LLC filed by Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc., Zazzle, Inc.. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MOTION for Leave to File Document / Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike SurReply filed by Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola on behalf of Ingeniador, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/6/2015 (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion re: 42 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Ingeniador, LLC. (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) Modified on 7/20/2015 to correct event and relationship (nat). (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the 46 Order entered on 07/15/2015 by Judge Francisco A. Besosa, this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for all further proceedings, including reports and recommendations on dispositive motions, except for the pretrial and trial. Signed by Clerk on 07/16/2015.(gr) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to Docket Entries 7 & 8, this case is now consolidated with Civil No. 15-1304 (FAB). Judge Daniel R. Dominguez no longer assigned to the case. All future pleadings are to be filed in the lead case, Civil No. 15-1304 (FAB). Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2015.(be) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a), Local Rule 42, and Hon. Francisco A. Besosa's acquiescence thereto, the Court hereby grants Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/10/2015. (MM) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COPY OF ORDER filed on 4/8/15 in Civil case 14-1304 (FAB): ORDER re (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases: GRANTED. Consolidation of 15-1305 (DRD) and 15-1306 (PAD) with 15-1304 (FAB) is ORDERED, subject to Judge Dominguez's and Judge Pedro Delgado's consent. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 4/8/15. (re) Modified on 4/10/2015 to correct signature date. (re). (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola on behalf of Ingeniador, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/27/2015 (Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc. (arg) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Ingeniador, LLC.(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of Ingeniador, LLC (Collazo-Soto, Maristella) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Blucora, Inc., Monoprice, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4327776.), filed by Ingeniador, LLC. Service due by 7/27/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 7,895,127, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Sheet, # 4 Summons Monoprice, Inc., # 5 Summons Blucora, Inc.)(Torres-Oyola, Eugenio) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ingeniador, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Blucora, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Monoprice, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZAZZLE INC., a California corporation is a litigant