This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 15:51:33 (UTC).

ING Bank N.V. v. M/V Glovis Superios, IMO No. 9674189

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 ING Bank N filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against v M/V Glovis Superios, IMO No 9674189. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-01250

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ING Bank N.V.

Defendant

M/V Glovis Superior, IMO No. 9674189

Not Yet Classified

National Maritime Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura E. Avery

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC*

45Th Floor, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert E. Warren

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert E. Warren

215 San Juan Dr.

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082

James D. Bercaw

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC*

45Th Floor, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

Robert J. Stefani

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, PLLC*

45Th Floor, 201 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to allow vessel to move within port and continue cargo operations by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#5

(#5) CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ING Bank N.V. (Warren, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#2

(#2) VERIFICATION Under Penalty of Perjury re 1 Complaint by ING Bank N.V. (KJR) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#10

(#10) NOTICE: Based upon the parties' filings, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (MHM) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian, National Maritime Services, Inc. appointed; granting 6 Motion to allow vessel to move within port and continue cargo operations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/21/2015. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report Form, # 2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ING Bank N.V. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Return of Property and Release of Vessel by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting 13 the plaintiff's motion for an order authorizing the release of M/V Glovis Superior and directing the United States Marshal to release the vessel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/23/2015. (LPB) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. The Clerk is directed to issue a warrant of arrest for the M/V Glovis Superior (official number 9674189), her engines, tackle, furniture, equipment, and all other necessary appurtenances thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/21/2015. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against M/V Glovis Superios, IMO No. 9674189 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX17975) filed by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Certificate of Liability Insurance)(KJR) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting 13 the plaintiff's motion for an order authorizing the release of M/V Glovis Superior and directing the United States Marshal to release the vessel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/23/2015. (LPB) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Return of Property and Release of Vessel by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ING Bank N.V. (Warren, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report Form, # 2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE: Based upon the parties' filings, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (MHM) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting 4 Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian, National Maritime Services, Inc. appointed; granting 6 Motion to allow vessel to move within port and continue cargo operations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/21/2015. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. The Clerk is directed to issue a warrant of arrest for the M/V Glovis Superior (official number 9674189), her engines, tackle, furniture, equipment, and all other necessary appurtenances thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/21/2015. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to allow vessel to move within port and continue cargo operations by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian. (KJR) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ING Bank N.V. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KJR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) VERIFICATION Under Penalty of Perjury re 1 Complaint by ING Bank N.V. (KJR) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against M/V Glovis Superios, IMO No. 9674189 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX17975) filed by ING Bank N.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Certificate of Liability Insurance)(KJR) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.