This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 04:12:49 (UTC).

In Re: Syngenta Ag Mir162 Corn Litigation

Case Summary

On 12/22/2014 a Other - Agriculture Subsidy case was filed by In Re Syngenta Ag Mir162 Corn Litigation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kansas District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-MD-02591

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Magistrate Judge James P. O'hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eagle-view Dairy, Llc

Michael D. Tiede

Thomas R. Busch

Martin W. Irwin

Duane Hess

Gaikowski Farms, Inc.

Gary Vontalge

Mary Lee Framstad

John C. Anderson

Old River Farms

6,164 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) TRANSFER ORDER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(mm) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#2

(#2) PRELIMINARY PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Corporate disclosure statements due by 1/14/2015. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 655 (KC) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Any proposals as to agenda items or proposed case management orders, shall be submitted by 1/14/2015. Counsel seeking a leadership role shall be present at the initial scheduling conference and shall submit to chambers an email proposal by 1/14/2015. Written statements are due by 1/16/2015. See this Order for email addresses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A, # 2 Attorney ECF Form A) (mg) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-1 (attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (mg) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER - The Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order 2 orders interested counsel seeking a leadership role in the organizational structure to submit a proposal to the Court no later than January 14, 2015. To clarify, the submissions proposing organizational structures are NOT to be filed but shall be emailed to Judge Lungstrum's chambers email account (ksd_lungstrum_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov) and Magistrate Judge O'Hara's chambers email account (ksd_ohara_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov), with copies provided to other plaintiff's counsel. Firm resumes are welcome and joint submissions are permitted. The page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1(e) do not apply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/30/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-2 (attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Graham, David) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diamond B Farms LLC, Eason Feed Lot, LLC, IAMO Ag Construction LLC, O&W Ag Enterprises, Inc., Payload Trucking Inc., Tri-K LLC. (Paul, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#12

(#12) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-3(attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (mm) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coulthard Farms, LLC. (Gayan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#1298

(#1298) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff Dixie Plantation Partnership Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#1297

(#1297) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff D&J Stoller, Inc. Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#1296

(#1296) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff LDT Keller Farms, LLC Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#1295

(#1295) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Produce US, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. of Production of Documents in response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (Schult, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#1294

(#1294) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Matthew Pelzer, Five Star Farms, Crandall Farms, White Brothers, Haerr Grain Farms, Three Guys Farming, Inc., JPPL, Inc., Dale Day, Day Farms LLC, McDonald AG, Inc., Thomas Justison of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#1293

(#1293) NOTICE of Request to be Removed from CM/ECF Electronic Service List by Rowan Farms, LLC, Shelton Farms, LLC (Methvin, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#1292

(#1292) RESPONSE re 1274 Order to Show Cause, 1275 Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Produce US, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.(Schult, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

#1291

(#1291) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gary Duane Mathews of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#1290

(#1290) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Five Star Farms, Crandall Farms, Ravenkamp Farms Partnership, HGF Irrigated, Three Guys Farming, Inc., Three H Farms LLC, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Dale Day, Richard R. Oswald, Richard R. Oswald((MOW #14-5151 / KS #15-2033-JWL-JPO)), McDonald AG East, Inc., Casey Wright, Christopher Wright, Lee Wright, Rosemarie Wright of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

744 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1298) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff Dixie Plantation Partnership Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1297) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff D&J Stoller, Inc. Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1296) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Kenneth Borah et al as to Plaintiff LDT Keller Farms, LLC Only without Prejudice (Toups, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1295) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Produce US, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. of Production of Documents in response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (Schult, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1294) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Matthew Pelzer, Five Star Farms, Crandall Farms, White Brothers, Haerr Grain Farms, Three Guys Farming, Inc., JPPL, Inc., Dale Day, Day Farms LLC, McDonald AG, Inc., Thomas Justison of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1293) NOTICE of Request to be Removed from CM/ECF Electronic Service List by Rowan Farms, LLC, Shelton Farms, LLC (Methvin, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1292) RESPONSE re 1274 Order to Show Cause, 1275 Order to Show Cause, by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Produce US, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.(Schult, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1291) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gary Duane Mathews of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1290) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Five Star Farms, Crandall Farms, Ravenkamp Farms Partnership, HGF Irrigated, Three Guys Farming, Inc., Three H Farms LLC, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Dale Day, Richard R. Oswald, Richard R. Oswald((MOW #14-5151 / KS #15-2033-JWL-JPO)), McDonald AG East, Inc., Casey Wright, Christopher Wright, Lee Wright, Rosemarie Wright of Responsive Documents (Powell, Scott) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1289) MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re 450 Amended Complaint,,,,, by In Re All Plaintiffs (for Lead/Liaison Counsel ONLY) (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
732 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by G. William Coulthard Testamentary Trust A, G. William Coulthard Testamentary Trust B. (Gayan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coulthard Farms, LLC. (Gayan, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-3(attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (mm) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diamond B Farms LLC, Eason Feed Lot, LLC, IAMO Ag Construction LLC, O&W Ag Enterprises, Inc., Payload Trucking Inc., Tri-K LLC. (Paul, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Graham, David) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-2 (attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER - The Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order 2 orders interested counsel seeking a leadership role in the organizational structure to submit a proposal to the Court no later than January 14, 2015. To clarify, the submissions proposing organizational structures are NOT to be filed but shall be emailed to Judge Lungstrum's chambers email account (ksd_lungstrum_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov) and Magistrate Judge O'Hara's chambers email account (ksd_ohara_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov), with copies provided to other plaintiff's counsel. Firm resumes are welcome and joint submissions are permitted. The page limitations set forth in Local Rule 7.1(e) do not apply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/30/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. See Schedule CTO-1 (attached) for the list of Tag-Along Actions. (mg) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRELIMINARY PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(a). Corporate disclosure statements due by 1/14/2015. An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 655 (KC) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Any proposals as to agenda items or proposed case management orders, shall be submitted by 1/14/2015. Counsel seeking a leadership role shall be present at the initial scheduling conference and shall submit to chambers an email proposal by 1/14/2015. Written statements are due by 1/16/2015. See this Order for email addresses. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A, # 2 Attorney ECF Form A) (mg) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) TRANSFER ORDER by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation in Syngenta AG MIR162 Corn Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(mm) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.