This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 02:28:10 (UTC).

IN RE: ATP Oil & Gas Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 IN RE ATP Oil Gas Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-03141

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Tow

Defendants

Pauline Van Der Sman-Archer

Houston, TX 77079-3406

Isabel Plume

George R Morris

Burt A. Adams

Robert M Shivers, III

George R. Edwards

Keith R Godwin

Walter Wendlandt

T Paul Bulmahn

Gerard J. Swonke

Robert J. Karow

John Tschirhart

Brent M. Longnecker

Arthur H. Dilly

Leland Tate

Albert L Reese, Jr.

G Ross Frazer

Respondent

U.S. Trustee

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2110

New Orleans, LA 70130

Debtor In Possession

ATP Oil & Gas Corporation

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Micah Dortch

Attorney at Cooper & Scully, PC

900 Jackson St., Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

David Bennett Parnell, Jr.

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

R Brent Cooper

Attorney at Cooper & Scully, PC

900 Jackson St., Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Christopher David Lindstrom

Attorney at Cooper & Scully, PC (Houston)

815 Walker Street, Suite 1040

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas Glenn Buck

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

James P. Sullivan

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (Austin)

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Matthew A. Woolf

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Michael J. Biles

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (Austin)

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Roy Clifton Cheatwood

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Tyler W Highful

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (Austin)

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Paul R. Bessette

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (Austin)

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 3200

Austin, TX 78701

Alicia Fazzano Castro

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP (Houston)

2800 Jpmorgan Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Corby Davin Boldissar

Attorney at Locke Lord (New Orleans)

601 Poydras St., Suite 2660

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mark D. Manela

Attorney at Manela Law Firm

440 Louisiana, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002

Debtor In Possession Attorneys

Bonnie N Hackler

Attorney at Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, PC

320 S. Boston Ave., Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3708

Timothy Aaron Million

Attorney at Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr, PC (Houston)

700 Milam St., Ste. 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Kay Austin Theunissen

Attorney at Mahtook & LaFleur (Lafayette)

600 Jefferson St., Suite 1000, P. O. Box 3089

Lafayette, LA 70502

Charles Stephen Kelley

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP (Houston)

700 Louisiana St., Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2730

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/4/16. (jjs) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#7

(#7) EXHIBITS re: 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana by Burt A Adams, Chris A Brisack, T Paul Bulmahn, Arthur H Dilly, George R Edwards, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, Robert J Karow, Brent M Longnecker, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr., Robert M Shivers, III, Gerard J Swonke, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart, Walter Wendlandt, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Bessette, Paul) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#59

(#59) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by T Paul Bulmahn, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr, Robert M Shivers, III, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart re 53 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint . (Woolf, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Louisiana; granting 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING 4 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/09/2015)

#8

(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rodney Tow.(Dortch, Timothy) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#61

(#61) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 60 Reply to Response to Motion. Please disregard previous notice. Document accepted per Doc. 46. (mmm) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

#1

(#1) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Immediate Withdrawal of the Reference Signed 6/9/15 by US Bankruptcy Judge Marvin Isgur(smurdock, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#58

(#58) ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/24/15. (jjs) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#56

(#56) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Governing Reply Briefs by T Paul Bulmahn, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Attorney Matthew A. Woolf added to party Robert M Shivers, III(pty:dft).(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 11/23/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#62

(#62) ORDER denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration of Transfer of Venue to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/4/16. (jjs) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#57

(#57) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Robert M Shivers, III as a filer. Another attorney represents this party. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#55

(#55) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 53 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint filed by Officer Defendants. (Parnell, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting 2 Motion to Withdraw Reference as to 14-03275.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#60

(#60) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Burt A. Adams, Chris A Brisack, Arthur H. Dilly, George R. Edwards, Robert J. Karow, Brent M. Longnecker, Gerard J. Swonke, Walter Wendlandt re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Castro, Alicia) Modified on 12/7/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/04/2015)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/4/16. (jjs) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration of Transfer of Venue to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/4/16. (jjs) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 60 Reply to Response to Motion. Please disregard previous notice. Document accepted per Doc. 46. (mmm) (Entered: 12/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Burt A. Adams, Chris A Brisack, Arthur H. Dilly, George R. Edwards, Robert J. Karow, Brent M. Longnecker, Gerard J. Swonke, Walter Wendlandt re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Castro, Alicia) Modified on 12/7/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by T Paul Bulmahn, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr, Robert M Shivers, III, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart re 53 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint . (Woolf, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/24/15. (jjs) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Robert M Shivers, III as a filer. Another attorney represents this party. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm) (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Governing Reply Briefs by T Paul Bulmahn, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Attorney Matthew A. Woolf added to party Robert M Shivers, III(pty:dft).(Woolf, Matthew) Modified on 11/23/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 53 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's second amended complaint filed by Officer Defendants. (Parnell, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Outside Directors. (Parnell, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:15-cv-01626. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (bwn) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Louisiana; granting 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rodney Tow.(Dortch, Timothy) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBITS re: 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana by Burt A Adams, Chris A Brisack, T Paul Bulmahn, Arthur H Dilly, George R Edwards, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, Robert J Karow, Brent M Longnecker, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr., Robert M Shivers, III, Gerard J Swonke, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart, Walter Wendlandt, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Bessette, Paul) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana by Burt A Adams, Chris A Brisack, T Paul Bulmahn, Arthur H Dilly, George R Edwards, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, Robert J Karow, Brent M Longnecker, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr., Robert M Shivers, III, Gerard J Swonke, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart, Walter Wendlandt, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING 4 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION by Rodney Tow, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dortch, Timothy) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting 2 Motion to Withdraw Reference as to 14-03275.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference as to Adversary Case No. 14-3275 by Burt A Adams, Chris A Brisack, T Paul Bulmahn, Arthur H Dilly, George R Edwards, G Ross Frazer, Keith R Godwin, Robert J Karow, Brent M Longnecker, George R Morris, Isabel Plume, Albert L Reese, Jr., Robert M Shivers, III, Gerard J Swonke, Leland Tate, John Tschirhart, Walter Wendlandt, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Originally filed 10/7/14)(smurdock, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Immediate Withdrawal of the Reference Signed 6/9/15 by US Bankruptcy Judge Marvin Isgur(smurdock, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 8/3/2015.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.