This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 04:26:06 (UTC).

In re: Aluminum Warehousing Antitrust Litigation (Consumer End User Plaintiffs)

Case Summary

On 04/28/2014 In re Aluminum Warehousing Antitrust Litigation Consumer End User Plaintiffs was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Katherine B. Forrest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-03122

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Katherine B. Forrest

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Javorsky

David J. Kohlenberg

Brick Pizzeria LLC

Defendants

Metro International Trade Services LLC

Henry Bath LLC

Does 1-25

Pacorini Metals USA LLC

GS Power Holdings LLC

Pacorini Metals AG

Metro International Services LLC

LME Holdings Limited

John Does 1-25

Glencore Xstrata PLC

London Metal Exchange Limited

The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.

JPMorgan Chase & Company

Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosalee Belinda Connell Thomas

Attorney at Finkelstein Thompson LLP

1077 30Th Street, N.W., Suite 150

Washington, DC 20007

Brian Russell Strange

Attorney at Starfield & Payne, P.C.

P.O. Box 880

Fort Washington, PA 19034

Michael Glenn McLellan

Attorney at Finkelstein Thompson LLP

1077 30Th Street, N.W., Suite 150

Washington, DC 20007

Eugene J. Benick

Attorney at Finkelstein Thompson LLP

1077 30Th Street, N.W., Suite 150

Washington, DC 20007

Douglas G. Thompson

Attorney at Finkelstein,Thompson & Loughran

1050 30Th, Nw

Washington, DC 20007

John Theodore Ceglia

Attorney at Strange & Carpenter

12100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Keith Lawrence Butler

Attorney at Strange & Carpenter

12100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian R. Strange

Attorney at Strange and Carpenter

12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Craig E. Hilborn

Attorney at Hilborn & Hilborn

999 Haynes, Suite 205

Birmingham, MI 48009

Defendant Attorneys

Richard C. Pepperman, II

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert D. Wick

Attorney at Covington & Burling, L.L.P. (DC)

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

John M. Nannes

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jessica A. Sprovtsoff

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

350 S. Main Street, Suite 210

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Gregory L. Curtner

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

350 South Main Street, Suite 210

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Margaret M. Zwisler

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP (DC)

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Does 1-25, GS Power Holdings LLC, Glencore Xstrata PLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Henry Bath LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Company, John Does 1-25, LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited, Metro International Services LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, Pacorini Metals AG, Pacorini Metals USA LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. Document filed by David J. Kohlenberg, Daniel Javorsky, Brick Pizzeria LLC.(laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#2

(#2) ORDER: In light of the Court's April 14, 2014 Order concerning the consolidation and termination of certain individual actions in this multidistrict litigation (ECF No. 276), the letters it received in response (ECF Nos. 306, 307), and the discussion at the status conference on April 25, 2014, the Clerk of Court is directed to open three new civil actions according to the following instructions. The first new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following eleven actions-13 Civ. 7642, 13 Civ. 8847, 13 Civ. 9095, 14 Civ. 134, 14 Civ. 135, 14 Civ. 176, 14 Civ. 185, 14 Civ. 213, 14 Civ. 214, 14 Civ. 215, and 14 Civ. 1855. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Second Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint at ECF No. 271 on the master docket. The second new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following seven actions-13 Civ. 6567, 13 Civ. 9062, 13 Civ. 9097, 14 Civ. 159, 14 Civ. 178, 14 Civ. 191, and 14 Civ. 199. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Commercial End Users' Corrected Consolidated Class Action Complaint at ECF No. 242 on the master docket. The third new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following two actions-13 Civ. 9222 and 14 Civ. 138. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Consumer at ECF No. 227 on the master docket. Each of these three new actions shall be made member and related cases in this multidistrict litigation. Upon the opening of these three new actions, the Clerk of Court is directed to close each of the twenty actions listed above. The Clerk of Court is also directed to close the following six actions-13 Civ. 5537, 13 Civ. 6689, 13 Civ. 9101, 14 Civ. 205, 14 Civ. 132, and 14 Civ. 216. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/28/2014) ORIGINALLY FILED in case: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER: that the Becnel Actions shall be considered part of the new action for the Commercial End User Plaintiffs (14 Civ. 3121) for purposes of the pending motions to dismiss, discovery disputes, and all other pretrial purposes for which these actions have been coordinated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the actions 13 Civ. 9095 and 14 Civ. 1855. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(tn) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4: Going forward, all parties shall comply with the requirement stated in Case Management Order No. 1 (ECF No. 153) and on the record during the April 25, 2014 conference (see 4/25/14 Tr. at 8-9, ECF No. 362) that all papers filed in this multidistrict litigation shall be filed on both the master docket and any of the three new actions to which it pertains. With respect to the motions to dismiss that have already been filed by defendants, the parties are directed to refile these documents in each of the three new actions to which they relate. The Court does not need additional courtesy copies. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al. (tn) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC.(Nannes, John) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC. (Nannes, John) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#8

(#8) JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (320 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss All Complaints on Sovereign Immunity Grounds. . Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Bonny E. Sweeney in Opposition re: (320 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss All Complaints on Sovereign Immunity Grounds.. Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-22, # 2 Exhibit 23-27, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29-34, # 5 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#69

(#69) DECLARATION of Richard C. Pepperman, II in Support re: (24 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (26 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (25 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (316 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., MCEPF Metro I, Inc., MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#68

(#68) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (26 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (25 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (316 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., MCEPF Metro I, Inc., MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Metro International Trade Services L.L.C., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#67

(#67) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Margaret M. Zwisler dated June 17, 2014 re: courtesy copy. Document filed by LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#66

(#66) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (10 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (10 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (10 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (312 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing. . Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Glencore Ltd., Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Henry Bath LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co, LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., Pacorini Metals USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-A, # 2 Appendix 1-B, # 3 Appendix 1-C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#65

(#65) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (6 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (331 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (6 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC, Pacorini Metals USA, LLC, Pacorini Metals USA L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Nannes, John) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Dial-In Information for June 20, 2014 Argument. Document filed by London Metal Exchange Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

#63

(#63) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Margaret M. Zwisler dated June 16, 2014 re: June 20, 2014 oral argument. Document filed by London Metal Exchange Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

#62

(#62) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (309 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (14 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (14 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Henry Bath LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Company, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Wick, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

#61

(#61) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bonny E. Sweeney, Christopher Lovell, Linda P. Nussbaum, Walter W. Noss, Garrett W. Wotkyns, Joseph H. Meltzer, John A. Kehoe, Jonathan W. Cuneo, and Douglas G. Thompson dated June 13, 2014 re: Response to LME's submissions of June 10 and June 11, 2014 (Dkt Nos. 431 and 436). Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc., Welk-Ko Fabricators, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 06/13/2014)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) DECLARATION of Richard C. Pepperman, II in Support re: (24 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (26 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (25 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (316 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., MCEPF Metro I, Inc., MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (26 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (25 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim., (316 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Antitrust Claims for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., MCEPF Metro I, Inc., MITSI Holdings LLC, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Metro International Trade Services L.L.C., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Margaret M. Zwisler dated June 17, 2014 re: courtesy copy. Document filed by LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (10 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (10 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (10 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing., (312 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing. . Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Glencore Ltd., Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Henry Bath LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co, LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited, Metro International Trade Services, L. L. C., Pacorini Metals USA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-A, # 2 Appendix 1-B, # 3 Appendix 1-C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (6 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (331 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (6 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC, Pacorini Metals USA, LLC, Pacorini Metals USA L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Nannes, John) (Entered: 06/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) NOTICE of Dial-In Information for June 20, 2014 Argument. Document filed by London Metal Exchange Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Margaret M. Zwisler dated June 16, 2014 re: June 20, 2014 oral argument. Document filed by London Metal Exchange Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:14-cv-03121-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (309 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (14 in 1:14-cv-03116-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints., (14 in 1:14-cv-03122-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Henry Bath LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Company, JP Morgan Chase & Co, JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Wick, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bonny E. Sweeney, Christopher Lovell, Linda P. Nussbaum, Walter W. Noss, Garrett W. Wotkyns, Joseph H. Meltzer, John A. Kehoe, Jonathan W. Cuneo, and Douglas G. Thompson dated June 13, 2014 re: Response to LME's submissions of June 10 and June 11, 2014 (Dkt Nos. 431 and 436). Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc., Welk-Ko Fabricators, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 06/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Margaret M. Zwisler dated June 11, 2014 re: plaintiffs' supplemental submission. Document filed by London Metal Exchange Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF, 1:14-cv-03116-KBF, 1:14-cv-03121-KBF, 1:14-cv-03122-KBF(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss All Federal and State Antitrust Claims for Lack of Antitrust Standing. Document filed by GS Power Holdings LLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Henry Bath LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Company, LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited, Metro International Trade Services LLC, Pacorini Metals USA LLC.(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Bonny E. Sweeney in Opposition re: (320 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss All Complaints on Sovereign Immunity Grounds.. Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-22, # 2 Exhibit 23-27, # 3 Exhibit 28, # 4 Exhibit 29-34, # 5 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (320 in 1:13-md-02481-KBF) MOTION to Dismiss All Complaints on Sovereign Immunity Grounds. . Document filed by AGFA Corporation, AGFA Graphics, NV, Admiral Beverage Corporation, Ampal Inc., Big River Outfitters, LLC, Brick Pizzeria LLC, Central Aluminum Company, Claridge Products and Equipment, Incorporated, Custom Aluminum Products Inc., D-Tek Manufacturing, Energy beverage management, llc, Extruded Aluminum Inc., F&F Custom Boats, LLC, International Extrusions Inc., Daniel Javorsky, David J Kohlenberg, Lexington Homes, Inc., Mag Instrument Inc, Master Screens Inc, Quicksilver Welding Services, Inc., River Parish Contractors, Inc., Seating Constructors USA, Inc., Talan Products, Inc., Team Ward Inc., Thule, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(Sweeney, Bonny) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. . Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC. (Nannes, John) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaints. Document filed by Pacorini Metals USA LLC.(Nannes, John) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4: Going forward, all parties shall comply with the requirement stated in Case Management Order No. 1 (ECF No. 153) and on the record during the April 25, 2014 conference (see 4/25/14 Tr. at 8-9, ECF No. 362) that all papers filed in this multidistrict litigation shall be filed on both the master docket and any of the three new actions to which it pertains. With respect to the motions to dismiss that have already been filed by defendants, the parties are directed to refile these documents in each of the three new actions to which they relate. The Court does not need additional courtesy copies. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al. (tn) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: that the Becnel Actions shall be considered part of the new action for the Commercial End User Plaintiffs (14 Civ. 3121) for purposes of the pending motions to dismiss, discovery disputes, and all other pretrial purposes for which these actions have been coordinated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the actions 13 Civ. 9095 and 14 Civ. 1855. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(tn) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: In light of the Court's April 14, 2014 Order concerning the consolidation and termination of certain individual actions in this multidistrict litigation (ECF No. 276), the letters it received in response (ECF Nos. 306, 307), and the discussion at the status conference on April 25, 2014, the Clerk of Court is directed to open three new civil actions according to the following instructions. The first new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following eleven actions-13 Civ. 7642, 13 Civ. 8847, 13 Civ. 9095, 14 Civ. 134, 14 Civ. 135, 14 Civ. 176, 14 Civ. 185, 14 Civ. 213, 14 Civ. 214, 14 Civ. 215, and 14 Civ. 1855. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Second Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint at ECF No. 271 on the master docket. The second new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following seven actions-13 Civ. 6567, 13 Civ. 9062, 13 Civ. 9097, 14 Civ. 159, 14 Civ. 178, 14 Civ. 191, and 14 Civ. 199. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Commercial End Users' Corrected Consolidated Class Action Complaint at ECF No. 242 on the master docket. The third new action shall contain all of the parties in each of the following two actions-13 Civ. 9222 and 14 Civ. 138. The first docket entry in this action shall be the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Consumer at ECF No. 227 on the master docket. Each of these three new actions shall be made member and related cases in this multidistrict litigation. Upon the opening of these three new actions, the Clerk of Court is directed to close each of the twenty actions listed above. The Clerk of Court is also directed to close the following six actions-13 Civ. 5537, 13 Civ. 6689, 13 Civ. 9101, 14 Civ. 205, 14 Civ. 132, and 14 Civ. 216. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/28/2014) ORIGINALLY FILED in case: 1:13-md-02481-KBF et al.(laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Does 1-25, GS Power Holdings LLC, Glencore Xstrata PLC, Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Henry Bath LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Company, John Does 1-25, LME Holdings Limited, London Metal Exchange Limited, Metro International Services LLC, Metro International Trade Services LLC, Pacorini Metals AG, Pacorini Metals USA LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. Document filed by David J. Kohlenberg, Daniel Javorsky, Brick Pizzeria LLC.(laq) (Entered: 05/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.