This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 19:15:03 (UTC).

Implus Footcare, LLC v. Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc. d/b/a Pro-Tec Athletics

Case Summary

On 12/18/2015 Implus Footcare, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc d/b/a Pro-Tec Athletics. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Chief Judge James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Implus Footcare, LLC

Defendant

Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Douglas Mills

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

Two Liberty Place, 50 South 16Th Street, Suite 3200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

E. Russell Tarleton

Attorney at Seed IP Law Group PLLC

701 5Th Ave, #5400

Seattle, WA 98104

Catharine B. Arrowood

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein

P.O. Box 389

Raleigh, NC 27602-0389

Michael P. Hogan

Attorney at Seed IP Law Group PLLC

701 5Th Ave, #5400

Seattle, WA 98104

Melanie Black Dubis

Attorney at Parker, Poe, Adams & Bernstein, LLP

301 Fayetteville St., Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

1 #7

Exhibit D - cease and desist letter

1 #6

Exhibit C - Photo of infringing product

1 #5

Exhibit B - Photos of GRID products

1 #4

Exhibit A - Patent 9,005,146

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Douglas Mills on behalf of Implus Footcare, LLC. (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

#5

(#5) PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on December 21, 2015. (Felder, J) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#6

(#6) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 5:15-CV-659-D. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 12/21/2015. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Jenkins, C.) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

#8

(#8) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint; and Preservation Notice filed by Implus Footcare, LLC served on John Doe (person authorized to accept service) on January 4, 2016. (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Catharine B. Arrowood on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Arrowood, Catharine) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Melanie Black Dubis on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Dubis, Melanie) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael P. Hogan on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Hogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Tarleton, E.) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#16

(#16) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Nicole Briggeman for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 2/25/2016. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Nicole Briggeman for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 2/25/2016. (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Tarleton, E.) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael P. Hogan on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Hogan, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Appearance filed by E. Russell Tarleton on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Tarleton, E.) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Complaint, filed by Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dubis, Melanie) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc. (Dubis, Melanie) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Melanie Black Dubis on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Dubis, Melanie) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Catharine B. Arrowood on behalf of Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc.. (Arrowood, Catharine) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint; and Preservation Notice filed by Implus Footcare, LLC served on John Doe (person authorized to accept service) on January 4, 2016. (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Jenkins, C.) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 5:15-CV-659-D. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 12/21/2015. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on December 21, 2015. (Felder, J) (Entered: 12/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Implus Footcare, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Implus, LLC for Implus Footcare, LLC. (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Douglas Mills on behalf of Implus Footcare, LLC. (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Maverick Sports Medicine, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-3522642.), filed by Implus Footcare, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Form AO120, # 4 Exhibit A - Patent 9,005,146, # 5 Exhibit B - Photos of GRID products, # 6 Exhibit C - Photo of infringing product, # 7 Exhibit D - cease and desist letter) (Mills, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less