This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 13:37:42 (UTC).

Hyun et al v. Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 Hyun filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-08706

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rachel Hsiung

Kelli Youngman

Jose Melgar

Zachary Willis

Jordan Ricasa

Adrian Javier

Mohammed Ullah

Seung Ha

Yoshiko Jones

Ninjin Zolboot

Kristofer Franks

Jaclyn Gramigna

Amalia May Valle Rebaza

Zain Khan

Mikhail Shevchenko

Joseph DeBenedetto

Natalie Starr

Maria Francisco

Defendants

Ippudo NY, LLC

Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc.

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

David Brian Feldman

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174-1299

Tanvir Haque Rahman

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Lawrence Michael Pearson

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Bryan Louis Arbeit

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Michelle L. Kornblit

Attorney at Wigdor LLP

85 Fifth Avenue, 5Th Fl.

New York, NY 10003

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

William Henry Weisman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Hirohisa Naito

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174-1299

John Vincent Baranello

Attorney at Moses & Singer LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#101

#102

#103

#104

#105

#106

#107

#108

#109

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement and Supporting Documents addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Lawrence M. Pearson dated January 22, 2016. Document filed by Maria Francisco, John Hyun, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Thanh Ta.(Pearson, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Bryan Louis Arbeit on behalf of Maria Francisco, John Hyun, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Thanh Ta. New Address: Wigdor LLP, 85 Fifth Ave, Fifth Floor, New York, New York, United States 10003, 212-257-6800. (Arbeit, Bryan) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) ORDER. The Court has been advised that the parties in this FLSA action have reached a settlement. See Dkt. No. 106. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, if the settlement is to take effect, the Court must first review and scrutinize the agreement to ensure that it is fair. See Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199, 206 (2d Cir. 2015). See also Wolinsky v. Scholastic Inc., 900 F. Supp. 2d 332, 338 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). Accordingly, on or before January 25, 2016, the parties must submit to the Court both the settlement agreement and a joint letter explaining why the settlement should be approved, and as further set forth in this Order. All upcoming conferences and deadlines in this case are adjourned sine die. Granting 106 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 9, 2015. Document filed by Maria Francisco, John Hyun, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Thanh Ta. The following deadline(s) was terminated: Pretrial Conference, Fact Discovery Deadline, Expert Discovery Deadline, Motions Deadline, Response Deadline, Reply Deadline. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/14/2015) (rjm). (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Settlement addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 9, 2015. Document filed by Maria Francisco, John Hyun, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Thanh Ta.(Pearson, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) ORDER granting 104 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David B. Feldman dated November 3, 2015. Document filed by Omar Alzindani, Jean Marc Andrianary, Tara Atthakorn, Maira Barriga, Joseph Belcastro, MD Chaudhury, Jose Cielo, Michael Cooper, Dominic Dacunto, Roxann De Armas, Joseph DeBenedetto, Cyrus Dennis, Christian Dominguez, Christian Downey, Lance Edwards, Lindsey Elsaesser, Robert Eng, Albert Escalera, Maria Francisco, Kristofer Franks, Eric Gomez, Jaclyn Gramigna, Seung Ha, Matilda Hernandez-Miyares, Rachel Hsiung, John Hyun, Ippudo Kuro-Obi, LLC, Ippudo NY, LLC, Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc., Ippudo Westside, LLC, Mohammed Iqbal, MD Khyrul Islam, Adrian Javier, Yoshiko Jones, Zain Khan, Josephine Luong, Moshe Maizels, Carrisa Matsushima, Jose Melgar, Lori J. Mizro, Jeurys Padilla, Alberto Ray Porteiro, Zack Praskin, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Mikhail Shevchenko, Natalie Starr, Thanh Ta, Jorge Torres, Malito Torres, Mohammed Ullah, Amalia May Valle Rebaza, Zachary Willis, Dorothy Wong, Margaret Mai Yamada, Kelli Youngman, Ninjin Zolboot. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/6/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David B. Feldman dated November 3, 2015. Document filed by Omar Alzindani, Jean Marc Andrianary, Tara Atthakorn, Maira Barriga, Joseph Belcastro, MD Chaudhury, Jose Cielo, Michael Cooper, Dominic Dacunto, Roxann De Armas, Joseph DeBenedetto, Cyrus Dennis, Christian Dominguez, Christian Downey, Lance Edwards, Lindsey Elsaesser, Robert Eng, Albert Escalera, Maria Francisco, Kristofer Franks, Eric Gomez, Jaclyn Gramigna, Seung Ha, Matilda Hernandez-Miyares, Rachel Hsiung, John Hyun, Ippudo Kuro-Obi, LLC, Ippudo NY, LLC, Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc., Ippudo Westside, LLC, Mohammed Iqbal, MD Khyrul Islam, Adrian Javier, Yoshiko Jones, Zain Khan, Josephine Luong, Moshe Maizels, Carrisa Matsushima, Jose Melgar, Lori J. Mizro, Jeurys Padilla, Alberto Ray Porteiro, Zack Praskin, Jordan Ricasa, Ryan Robinett, Mikhail Shevchenko, Natalie Starr, Thanh Ta, Jorge Torres, Malito Torres, Mohammed Ullah, Amalia May Valle Rebaza, Zachary Willis, Dorothy Wong, Margaret Mai Yamada, Kelli Youngman, Ninjin Zolboot.(Feldman, David) (Entered: 11/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Malito Torres.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Christian Downey.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 08/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) ORDER. On August 27, 2015, the Court received a joint letter from the parties requesting a forty-five day extension of the fact discovery deadline, currently set for September 30, 2015. The parties' joint request is GRANTED. The schedule as set forth in this Court's June 1, 2015 Order (Dkt. No. 41) and July 15, 2015 Order (Dkt. No. 56) is modified as follows: Fact discovery shall close on or before November 14, 2015; Expert discovery shall close on or before January 11, 2016; Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before February 12, 2016; oppositions shall be due on or before March 11, 2016; and replies, if any, shall be due on or before March 25, 2016. The Joint Pretrial Report shall be filed within 30 days of the close of all discovery or, if a dispositive motion has been filed, within 30 days of a decision on such motion(s). Granting 100 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Motions due by 2/12/2016). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/28/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Seeking Referral to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement Discussions addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David B. Feldman dated 8/27/2015. Document filed by Ippudo Kuro-Obi, LLC, Ippudo NY, LLC, Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc., Ippudo Westside, LLC.(Feldman, David) (Entered: 08/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ippudo NY, LLC served on 11/3/2014, answer due 11/24/2014. Service was accepted by Toshiya Suganuma, Director. Document filed by Thanh Ta; John Hyun; Jordan Ricasa; Maria Francisco; Ryan Robinett. (Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc. served on 11/3/2014, answer due 11/24/2014. Service was accepted by Toshiya Suganuma, Director. Document filed by Thanh Ta; John Hyun; Jordan Ricasa; Maria Francisco; Ryan Robinett. (Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ryan Robinett.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Maria Francisco.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Thanh Ta.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jordan Ricasa.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by John Hyun.(Rahman, Tanvir) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (lcu) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Ippudo Kuro-Obi, LLC, Ippudo NY, LLC, Ippudo USA Holdings, Inc., Ippudo Westside, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401108655)Document filed by Thanh Ta, John Hyun, Jordan Ricasa, Maria Francisco, Ryan Robinett.(lcu) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (Entered: 11/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Brian Feldman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Hays Weissman