This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 04:35:30 (UTC).

Hyatt v. Vivint Solar, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2014 Hyatt filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Vivint Solar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Katherine B. Forrest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-09283

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Katherine B. Forrest

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Robby Shawn Stadnick

All-Pro Title Group, LLC

Michael Perrotta

Defendants

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Todd R. Pedersen

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC

Goldman, Sachs & Co.

Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P.

Barclays Capital Inc.

Joseph F. Trustey

Bruce McEvoy

Joseph S. Tibbetts

Alex J. Dunn

Vivint Solar, Inc.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Dana C. Russell

The Blackstone Group L.P.

Peter F. Wallace

Gregory S. Butterfield

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Adam M. Apton

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP (DC)

1101 30Th, Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20007

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Phillip C. Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm P.A.

350 5Th Avenue, Suite 5508

New York, NY 10118

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Vizcarrondo

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Carrie Marie Reilly

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Steven Peter Winter

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Jay B. Kasner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP (NYC)

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

Samuel Howard Rudman

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP(LI)

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Barclays Capital Inc., Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P., Gregory S. Butterfield, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, David F. D'Alessandro, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Alex J. Dunn, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Bruce McEvoy, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, The Blackstone Group L.P., Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401110537)Document filed by Brennen Hyatt.(lcu) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gregory S. Butterfield waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; David F. D'Alessandro waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Alex J. Dunn waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Bruce McEvoy waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Todd R. Pedersen waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Dana C. Russell waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Joseph S. Tibbetts waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Joseph F. Trustey waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Peter F. Wallace waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/3/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Vivint Solar, Inc. served on 11/25/2014, answer due 12/16/2014. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Dana C. Russell served on 11/25/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Gregory S. Butterfield served on 11/25/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Gregory S. Butterfield, David F. D'Alessandro, Alex J. Dunn, Bruce McEvoy, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Gregory S. Butterfield, David F. D'Alessandro, Alex J. Dunn, Bruce McEvoy, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff., MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Document filed by Michael Perrotta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by Michael Perrotta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#24

(#24) DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 ., MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 . MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#27

(#27) DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 . MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

#28

(#28) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. ENDORSEMENT: Any opposition to this motion or motions filed at ECF Nos. 20/25 shall be filed not later than 1/27/15. No replies., ( Responses due by 1/27/2015.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/21/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. ENDORSEMENT: Any opposition to this motion or motions filed at ECF Nos. 20/25 shall be filed not later than 1/27/15. No replies., ( Responses due by 1/27/2015.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/21/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 . MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 . MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:14-cv-09283, 1:14-cv-09709 ., MOTION to Appoint All-Pro Title Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by All-Pro Title Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Appoint Robby Shawn Stadnick to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Robby Shawn Stadnick. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. MOTION to Consolidate Cases . . Document filed by Michael Perrotta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.., MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff., MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Document filed by Michael Perrotta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group L.P. for Vivint Solar, Inc.. Document filed by Vivint Solar, Inc..(Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vivint Solar, Inc..(Kasner, Jay) Modified on 1/13/2015 (lb). (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Gregory S. Butterfield, David F. D'Alessandro, Alex J. Dunn, Bruce McEvoy, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Gregory S. Butterfield, David F. D'Alessandro, Alex J. Dunn, Bruce McEvoy, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Kasner, Jay) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Gregory S. Butterfield served on 11/25/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Dana C. Russell served on 11/25/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Vivint Solar, Inc. served on 11/25/2014, answer due 12/16/2014. Service was accepted by Brianne Lund, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/3/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gregory S. Butterfield waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; David F. D'Alessandro waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Alex J. Dunn waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Bruce McEvoy waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Todd R. Pedersen waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Dana C. Russell waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Joseph S. Tibbetts waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Joseph F. Trustey waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015; Peter F. Wallace waiver sent on 11/26/2014, answer due 1/26/2015. Document filed by Brennen Hyatt. (Blasy, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Barclays Capital Inc., Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P., Gregory S. Butterfield, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, David F. D'Alessandro, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Alex J. Dunn, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Bruce McEvoy, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Todd R. Pedersen, Dana C. Russell, The Blackstone Group L.P., Joseph S. Tibbetts, Joseph F. Trustey, Vivint Solar, Inc., Peter F. Wallace. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401110537)Document filed by Brennen Hyatt.(lcu) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (lcu) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blackstone Advisory Partners Lp is a litigant

Latest cases where Vivint Solar Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BLACKSTONE GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Stanley Delta Holdings, LLC dba Morgan Stanley Private Bank, National Association is a litigant