This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:11:34 (UTC).

Huml v. State of Texas

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Huml filed an Other lawsuit against State of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge David C Guaderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David C Guaderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beatriz Huml

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

State of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A. Roman

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1018 Brown Street

El Paso, TX 79902

John Joseph LoCurto

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

601 Nw Loop 410, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Defendant Attorney

Edward L. Marshall

Attorney at Assistant Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) QUI TAM COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 300022723), filed by Beatriz Huml.(jg1) Modified on 5/4/2015 (jg1). (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#2

(#2) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 300022723 (jg1) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#3

(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Beatriz Huml. (jg1) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

#4

(#4) Sealed Document filed (lc3) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#5

(#5) Order Unsealing Case. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing by Beatriz Huml (lc3) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER DENYING 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#32

(#32) Second MOTION for Entry of Default Judgement by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 12/2/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 12/01/2015)

#31

(#31) RESPONSE to 29 Order to Show Cause by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#30

(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beatriz Huml. State of Texas served on 7/23/2015, answer due 8/13/2015. (st) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#29

(#29) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Beatriz Huml, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2015,. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (st) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#27

(#27) AFFIDAVIT in Support by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Assurance by Beatriz Huml (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#25

(#25) Notice and Final Judgment by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 11/18/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#24

(#24) Notice Lack of Jurisdiction by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 11/18/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 10/21/2015)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Second MOTION for Entry of Default Judgement by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 12/2/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RESPONSE to 29 Order to Show Cause by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LoCurto, John) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beatriz Huml. State of Texas served on 7/23/2015, answer due 8/13/2015. (st) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Beatriz Huml, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2015,. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (st) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) AFFIDAVIT in Support by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Assurance by Beatriz Huml (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice and Final Judgment by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 11/18/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Notice Lack of Jurisdiction by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) Modified on 11/18/2015 (lc3). (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Filing by Beatriz Huml (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Roman, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing by Beatriz Huml (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 08/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DENYING 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing by Beatriz Huml (lc3) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Beatriz Huml. (Roman, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Unsealing Case. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lc3) (Entered: 07/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Sealed Document filed (lc3) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Beatriz Huml. (jg1) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 300022723 (jg1) (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) QUI TAM COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 300022723), filed by Beatriz Huml.(jg1) Modified on 5/4/2015 (jg1). (Entered: 05/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.