This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2016 at 17:08:24 (UTC).

Hospira Inc. et al v. Eurohealth International Sarl et al.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2014 Hospira Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Eurohealth International Sarl. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Gregory M. Sleet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Gregory M. Sleet

 

Party Details

Defendants and Counter Claimants

West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Counter Defendants

Orion Corporation

Hospira Inc.

Counter Claimants

Eurohealth International Sarl

West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.

Ben Venue Laboratories Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Karen Elizabeth Keller

David M. Fry

Jeffrey Thomas Castellano

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1120

Wilmington, DE 19801

Cynthia L Hardman

Brian J. Prew

Counter Defendant Attorneys

John M. Seaman

Sarah E. Hickie

Mary Matterer

Richard K. Herrmann

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1500688.) - filed by Orion Corporation, Hospira Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 09/06/2013. Date of Expiration of Patent: 03/31/2019. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: None (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,716,867;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Price T. Rowe Associates Inc. for Hospira Inc. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yusuf Esat, Attorney Sara Tonnies Horton, and Attorney Bradford P. Lyerla - filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orion Corporation, Hospira Inc.. Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. served on 6/26/2014, answer due 7/17/2014. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation by Ben Venue Laboratories Inc..(Fry, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation for Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. filed by Ben Venue Laboratories Inc.. (Fry, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#104

(#104) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Supplemental Infringement Contentions re 65 Notice of Service filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

#105

(#105) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) the Opening Expert Report of Charles Medico, Pharm.D., BCPS; (ii) the Opening Expert Report of Bruce Friedman, M.D., on Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,716,867; and (iii) the Opening Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

#106

(#106) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Expert Report of Jesse B. Hall, M.D. and 2. Defendants Eurohealth International Sarl and West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.'s Second Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 01/18/2016)

#107

(#107) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 1/27/16 at 11:30 AM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. Counsel for Hospira shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/16. (cak) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#108

(#108) ORAL ORDER: Teleconferences with Judge Thynge have been scheduled as follows: 2/16/16 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time (counsel were initially told the teleconference would be at 9:30. Due to a scheduling conflict it had to be moved to 10:00) to be initiated by defense counsel. 3/7/16 at 8:30 AM Eastern Time to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/27/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00487-GMS, 1:14-cv-01008-GMS(cak) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#109

(#109) ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 5/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/1/16. (cak) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#110

(#110) STIPULATION (and proposed order) to extend deadlines to exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports to February 16, 2016; to exchange Reply Expert Reports to March 8, 2016; and to Complete Expert Discovery by March 30, 2016 re (96 in 1:14-cv-01008-GMS, 102 in 1:14-cv-00487-GMS) Stipulation, (31 in 1:14-cv-00487-GMS, 25 in 1:14-cv-01008-GMS) Proposed Order by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#111

(#111) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Rebuttal Expert Report of Ivan T. Hofmann, CPA/CFF, CLP; 2. Rebuttal Expert Report of Stephen Small, M.D. Regarding Non-Infringement; and 3. Rebuttal Expert Report of Gourang Patel, B.S. Chem, Pharm.D., MSC., BCCCP, BCPS filed by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

#112

(#112) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) the Rebuttal Expert Report of Michael A.E. Ramsay, M.D. on Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,716,867; and (ii) the Second Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) the Rebuttal Expert Report of Michael A.E. Ramsay, M.D. on Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,716,867; and (ii) the Second Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Rebuttal Expert Report of Ivan T. Hofmann, CPA/CFF, CLP; 2. Rebuttal Expert Report of Stephen Small, M.D. Regarding Non-Infringement; and 3. Rebuttal Expert Report of Gourang Patel, B.S. Chem, Pharm.D., MSC., BCCCP, BCPS filed by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) STIPULATION (and proposed order) to extend deadlines to exchange Rebuttal Expert Reports to February 16, 2016; to exchange Reply Expert Reports to March 8, 2016; and to Complete Expert Discovery by March 30, 2016 re (96 in 1:14-cv-01008-GMS, 102 in 1:14-cv-00487-GMS) Stipulation, (31 in 1:14-cv-00487-GMS, 25 in 1:14-cv-01008-GMS) Proposed Order by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 5/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/1/16. (cak) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) ORAL ORDER: Teleconferences with Judge Thynge have been scheduled as follows: 2/16/16 at 10:00 AM Eastern Time (counsel were initially told the teleconference would be at 9:30. Due to a scheduling conflict it had to be moved to 10:00) to be initiated by defense counsel. 3/7/16 at 8:30 AM Eastern Time to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/27/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00487-GMS, 1:14-cv-01008-GMS(cak) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 1/27/16 at 11:30 AM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. Counsel for Hospira shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/16. (cak) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Expert Report of Jesse B. Hall, M.D. and 2. Defendants Eurohealth International Sarl and West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.'s Second Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Eurohealth International Sarl, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 01/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) the Opening Expert Report of Charles Medico, Pharm.D., BCPS; (ii) the Opening Expert Report of Bruce Friedman, M.D., on Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,716,867; and (iii) the Opening Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 01/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Supplemental Infringement Contentions re 65 Notice of Service filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Hickie, Sarah) (Entered: 01/13/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) SO ORDERED - re (96 in 1:14-cv-01008-GMS, 102 in 1:14-cv-00487-GMS) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order Scheduling Order Deadlines: ( Fact Discovery completed by 1/7/2016., Opening Expert Reports due by 1/15/2016., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 2/12/2016., Reply Expert Reports due by 3/4/2016., Expert Discovery due by 3/29/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/2/2016.). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/14/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00487-GMS, 1:14-cv-01008-GMS(mdb) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim -- Plaintiffs' Answer to Ben Venue's Counterclaims -- by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation.(Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation for Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. filed by Ben Venue Laboratories Inc.. (Fry, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation by Ben Venue Laboratories Inc..(Fry, David) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orion Corporation, Hospira Inc.. Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. served on 6/26/2014, answer due 7/17/2014. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yusuf Esat, Attorney Sara Tonnies Horton, and Attorney Bradford P. Lyerla - filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation. (Matterer, Mary) (Entered: 04/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Price T. Rowe Associates Inc. for Hospira Inc. filed by Hospira Inc., Orion Corporation. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,716,867;. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 09/06/2013. Date of Expiration of Patent: 03/31/2019. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: None (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against Ben Venue Laboratories Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1500688.) - filed by Orion Corporation, Hospira Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) (Entered: 04/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less