This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2016 at 07:21:21 (UTC).

High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC v. Printograph Inc

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Printograph Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-03795

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

High Quality Printing Inventions LLC

Defendant

Printograph Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shellie Stephens

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4800W

Dallas, TX 75201

G Donald Puckett

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Ft. Worth, TX 76107

Lamar Clinton Crosby

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

3414 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30326

Samuel Flint Miller

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorney

Chris L Gilbert

Attorney at Gilbert Law PC

100 Crescent Court, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

#19

#20

#21

#22

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO ORDER [DOC.21] filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC. (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Action [Docket Entry # 19 ]. The Motion is GRANTED. This action is STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation has ruled on whether to consolidate and transfer the present action to a multidistrict litigation proceeding for pretrial purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/19/2016) (sss) (Entered: 01/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC re 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1) (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Action filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings) (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Docket Entry # 17 ). The Motion is GRANTED. The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including 2/6/2016. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/7/2016) (bdb) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Printograph Inc (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Gilbert, Chris) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris L Gilbert on behalf of Printograph Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gilbert, Chris) (Entered: 01/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting Plaintiff High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC's 12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Donald Puckett. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/5/2016) (twd) (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Printograph Inc ; served on 12/17/2015. (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 12/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Donald Puckett filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Counsel) (Stephens, Shellie) Modified on 12/30/2015 (ykp). (Entered: 12/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shellie Stephens on behalf of High Quality Printing Inventions LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stephens, Shellie) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing Motion to Transfer and Consolidate for Pretrial filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit(s) Memo in Support, # 3 Exhibit(s) Schedule of Actions, # 4 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service) (Puckett, G) (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY/ FILED IN THE WRONG CASE/WILL REFILE***NOTICE of Filing Motion to Transfer and Consolidate for Pretrial filed by High Quality Printing Inventions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s)) (Puckett, G) Modified on 12/11/2015 (ykp). (Entered: 12/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Printograph Inc. (ndt) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct holder on 11/25/2015) (sss). (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Fish. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Modern Universal Printing LLC for High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC. (Puckett, G) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC. (Puckett, G) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Printograph, Inc. d/b/a GotPrint filed by High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7212497) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Additional Page(s), # 3 Cover Sheet) (Puckett, G) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where High Quality Printing Inventions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINTOGRAPH INC. A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS ORGANIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lamar Clinton Crosby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shellie Stephens(Designation Retained)