This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2016 at 08:48:31 (UTC).

Henson et al v. Turn, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 Henson filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Turn, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-01497

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Cintron

Anthony Henson

Defendant

TURN, INC.

Amicus Curiae

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Diamand

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein LLP

250 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013-1413

Joseph Henry Bates, III

Attorney at Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

2800 Cantrell Rd.,, Suite 510

Little Rock, AR 72202

Nimish Ramesh Desai

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael W. Sobol

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Bradley Scott Clanton,

Attorney at Clanton Legal Group, PLLC

1818 Crane Ridge Drive, Suite 202

Jackson, MS 39216

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Rubin

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Anthony J Weibell

Attorney at Wilson Sonsino Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Stephen Nathaniel Gikow

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Scott Harris Angstreich

Attorney at Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans and Figel, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Henry Weissmann

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission St, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 95105-2907

Jessica C Collins

Attorney at Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans and Figel, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw

Washington Dc, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Turn, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Cintron, Anthony Henson re 1 Complaint, Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Weibell , by Michael H. Rubin, and by Stephen N. Gikow (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Turn, Inc... (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Turn, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#33

(#33) ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott H. Angstreich (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#34

(#34) ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jessica C. Collins (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#35

(#35) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Motion Date for Pending Motions, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Turn, Inc.. (Angstreich, Scott) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/8/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#36

(#36) ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION Rescheduling Motion Date for Pending Motions. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#37

(#37) Memorandum in Opposition re 29 Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae, filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/8/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2015)

#38

(#38) Reply Memorandum re 29 Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant Turn Inc.s Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) this Action to Compel Arbitration, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Angstreich, Scott) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/15/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#39

(#39) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Turn's Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) This Action to Compel Arbitration filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nimish R. Desai, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Redacted Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Opposition Brief)(Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/12/2015) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#40

(#40) [REDACTED] Memorandum in Opposition re 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Stay, filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/15/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2015)

#41

(#41) Statement of Non-Opposition re 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Turn's Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) This Action to Compel Arbitration filed byTurn, Inc.. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2015) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Statement of Non-Opposition re 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Turn's Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) This Action to Compel Arbitration filed byTurn, Inc.. (Related document(s) 39 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2015) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) [REDACTED] Memorandum in Opposition re 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Stay, filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/15/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Turn's Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) This Action to Compel Arbitration filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nimish R. Desai, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Redacted Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Opposition Brief)(Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/12/2015) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Reply Memorandum re 29 Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant Turn Inc.s Motion to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative to Stay) this Action to Compel Arbitration, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Angstreich, Scott) (Filed on 6/12/2015) Modified on 6/15/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Memorandum in Opposition re 29 Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae, filed by William Cintron, Anthony Henson. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/8/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION Rescheduling Motion Date for Pending Motions. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Motion Date for Pending Motions, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Turn, Inc.. (Angstreich, Scott) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 6/8/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jessica C. Collins (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott H. Angstreich (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jessica C. Collins ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9545953.) filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Collins, Jessica) (Filed on 5/26/2015) Modified on 5/27/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Response to Complaint and Continuation of Case Management Conference filed by Turn, Inc.. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Turn, Inc. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Turn, Inc... (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Weibell , by Michael H. Rubin, and by Stephen N. Gikow (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Cintron, Anthony Henson re 1 Complaint, Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Turn, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 4/1/2015) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Turn, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9408721.). Filed by Anthony Henson, William Cintron. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Desai, Nimish) (Filed on 4/1/2015) Modified on 4/2/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Turn, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica C Collins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott H. Angstreich, Esq.