This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 08:53:24 (UTC).

Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC v. Kyocera Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kyocera Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-10376

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC

Counter Claimant

Kyocera Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alvin Lee

Craig W. Horn

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Keefe A. Brooks

William V. O'Connor

Gregory P. Stone

Jessica Anne Roberts

David C. Doyle

Daniel Benjamin Levin

Christian G. Andreu-von Euw

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *03/08/2016*. Designated lead case number is *15-11236*. (SSch) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

1 #3

Exhibit C-Corporate Entity Details

1 #2

Exhibit B-Dow Corning Announcement of Acquisition of Hemlock LLC

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Kyocera Corporation (Brooks, Keefe) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Lee on behalf of Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Doyle on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Doyle, David) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William V. O'Connor on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Response due by 2/26/2016) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Stone on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Stone, Gregory) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Benjamin Levin on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Levin, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Cases and Directing Filings. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SSch) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *03/08/2016*. Designated lead case number is *15-11236*. (SSch) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Cases and Directing Filings. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SSch) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Benjamin Levin on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Levin, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P. Stone on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Stone, Gregory) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER to Submit Material for Case Management Order. (Response due by 2/26/2016) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (Sian, M) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Kyocera Corporation against Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC by Kyocera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Anne Roberts on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Roberts, Jessica) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Andreu-von Euw on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Andreu-von Euw, Christian) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by William V. O'Connor on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Doyle on behalf of Kyocera Corporation. (Doyle, David) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Lee on behalf of Hemlock Semiconductor, LLC. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Kyocera Corporation (Brooks, Keefe) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kyocera Corporation from Saginaw County Circuit Court, case number 15-027947-CB. Receipt No: 0645-5535962 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 15-cv-11236, Judge Hon. Thomas L. Ludington] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B-Dow Corning Announcement of Acquisition of Hemlock LLC, # 3 Exhibit C-Corporate Entity Details) (Brooks, Keefe) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hemlock Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Kyocera Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian G. Andreu-von Euw

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Anne Roberts